Enid Lakeside Grocery, LLC
Mississippi Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jason D Woodard |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10248 |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2019 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 20, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Enid Lakeside Grocery, LLC
2570 Enid Dam Rd
Pope, MS 38658-3068 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
501 East Court Street, Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 12:02 PM CDT |