CTI Global Solutions, Inc.
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Wendelin I Lipp |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-11021 |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2017 |
Debtor
CTI Global Solutions, Inc.
9500 Arena Dr Ste 260
Upper Marlboro, MD 20774-3709 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Steven H Greenfeld
Cohen, Baldinger & Greenfeld, LLC 2600 Tower Oaks Blvd. Suite 103
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Docket last updated: 03/03/2017 4:24 PM EST |
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 | ||
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7
Wed 01/25 7:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Steven H Greenfeld, with 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
33
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 01/25 7:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335 Filed by CTI Global Solutions, Inc.. (Tapp, Barry) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Wed 01/25 7:54 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Barry M. Tapp. (Tapp, Barry) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 01/25 7:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11021 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 29997933. Fee amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4 Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Steven H Greenfeld, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2017 at 11:30 AM at 341 meeting room 6th Floor at 6305 Ivy Ln., Greenbelt. |