In Re: Sammy Eljamal
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Nelson Stephen Roman |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-00609 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2018 |
Debtor
Sammy Eljamal
, |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 25, 2017 5:19 AM EDT |
Appellant
Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
NY Dealer Stations, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
NY Fuel Distributors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
NY Fuel Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
Leon Silverman
|
Represented By
|
Appellant
James A. Weil
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Sammy Eljamal
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Sammy Eljamal
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 07/02 2:20 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: re:7 Memorandum & Opinion. in favor of Sammy Eljamal against Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, James A. Weil, Leon Silverman. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 29, 2018, Appellant's motion for leave to appeal is denied as the December 28 Decision is an interlocutory order not immediately appealable under the collateral order doctrine and the Court otherwise declines to exercise its discretion under Section 158(a) (3) to permit appeal thereof. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 06/29/2018)(dt) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Right to Appeal | ||
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
9
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 06/29 5:58 PM
OPINION & ORDER re:3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, James A. Weil, Leon Silverman, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC. In accordance with the foregoing, Appellants' Motion for leave to appeal is denied, as the December 28 Decision is an interlocutory order not immediately appealable under the collateral order doctrine and this Court otherwise declines to exercise its discretion under Section 158(a)(3) to permit appeal thereof. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 3. The Clerk of the Court is further respectfully directed to terminate the appeal. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 6/29/2018) (mml) |
|
misc
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk
Fri 06/29 5:59 PM
Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re:7 Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (mml) |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Tue 01/31 11:35 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Steven J. Harfenist dated January 31, 2017 re: Withdrawal of arguement in motion for leave to appeal. Document filed by Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, Leon Silverman, James A. Weil.(Harfenist, Steven) |
|
Thursday, January 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
Thu 01/26 5:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Document filed by Sammy Eljamal. (bkmc) |
|
4 | 4
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Thu 01/26 5:31 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:3 MOTION for Leave to Appeal. Document filed by Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, Leon Silverman, James A. Weil. (bkmc) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Leave to Appeal
Thu 01/26 5:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal Document filed by Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, Leon Silverman, James A. Weil.(bkmc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 01/26 5:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkmc) |
|
1 | 1
appeal
Bankruptcy Appeal
Thu 01/26 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Robert D. Drain dated 12/28/2016. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 15-8358 15-22872 (RDD). Document filed by Leon Silverman, NY Dealer Stations, LLC, James A. Weil, NY Fuel Holdings, LLC, Metro NY Dealer Stations, LLC, NY Dealer Stations Management, LLC, NY Fuel Distributors, LLC.(bkmc) |
|
Att: 1 Order signed 12/28/2016 by USBC Judge Robert D. Drain |