FLEMMING'S GRILL, INC.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10358 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | May 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 30, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $50,001 to $100,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $0 to $50,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
FLEMMING'S GRILL, INC.
6494 Boulder Ranch Ave Ste 100
Henderson, NV 89011-5045 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |