Modulare, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10179
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10179
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin Gross |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10178 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Modulare, Inc.
9891 Irvine Center Dr Ste 222
Irvine, CA 92618-4320 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago |
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 01/29 8:56 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (SH) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Final Decree
Fri 01/26 2:39 PM
Order and Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 1/26/2018 (SH) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity
Fri 05/12 12:03 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch D, ,. Filed by Modulare, Inc.. (Finizio, GianClaudio) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Joint Administration Order
Tue 01/31 11:33 AM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases. The Bankruptcy Court has entered an Order that provides for joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Insightra Medical, Inc., and its affiliate Modulare, Inc. The docket in the case of Insightra Medical, Inc., Case No. 17-10179 KG), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 1/31/2017. (LCN) |
|
5 | 5
vCal
Minute Entry
Tue 01/31 10:31 AM
Minutes of Hearing held on: 01/31/2017 Subject: FIRST DAY MOTIONS AND FIRST DAY MOTIONS. (vCal Hearing ID (224254)). (SS) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Schedules/Statements
Fri 01/27 6:57 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Modulare, Inc.. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
6
pgs
motion
Joint Administration - Motion (Multi)
Fri 01/27 5:03 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Insightra Medical, Inc.. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Fri 01/27 4:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10178 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8320609, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 01/27 4:05 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Modulare, Inc.. (Alberto, Justin) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Fri 01/27 4:34 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case. (AK) |