New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John K Olson |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-11037 |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC
701 S Federal Hwy
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316-1218 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 06/08 11:48 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Grooms, Desiree) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/16 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 03/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
32 | 32
misc
Notice of Apptmt/Non-Apptmt of Creditors Committee
Wed 03/15 11:34 AM
Until Further Notice, the United States Trustee Will Not Appoint a Committee of Creditors Pursuant to 11 USC Section 1102. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (^UST12, KES) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Convert Case from 11 to 7 Order
Mon 03/13 1:02 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Case . Dismissal Shall Be with 6 Months Prejudice [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00], Denying Motion to Convert Case to Chapter 7 (Grooms, Desiree) |
|
Sunday, March 05, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Mon 03/06 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 03/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Mon 03/06 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 03/05/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Sat 03/04 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 03/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
court
Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)
Fri 03/03 1:26 PM
Amended Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 at 01:30 PM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
26 | 26
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Fri 03/03 1:25 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 at 10:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Convert Case from Chapter 11 to 7
Fri 03/03 1:07 PM
Emergency Motion to Dismiss Case , or in the alternative Motion to Convert Chapter 11 Case to Chapter 7 . [Fee Waived] Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Scarlett, Zana) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Wed 03/01 3:10 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Susan D. Lasky Esq . (Lasky, Susan) |
|
23 | 23
court
Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)
Wed 03/01 2:03 PM
Re- Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 at 01:30 PM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Tue 02/28 5:02 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 03/07/2017 at 10:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
21 | 21
trustee
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors [PAPERLESS]
Tue 02/28 3:05 PM
Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee . 341(a) Meeting Continued to 3/16/2017 at 01:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. (Scarlett, Zana) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Fri 02/24 1:39 PM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Susan D. Lasky Esq. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Equity Security Holders
Fri 02/24 1:38 PM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Schedules/Statements or Amended Schedules/Statements
Fri 02/24 1:35 PM
Initial Schedules Filed: [Summary of Your Assets/Liabilities,Schedule A/B,Schedule D,Schedule E/F,Schedule G,Schedule H,Statement of Financial Affairs,Declaration re Schedules,] Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 02/24 1:18 PM
Expedited Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Extend Time
Fri 02/24 1:08 PM
Debtor's Expedited Motion to Extend Time to Obtain Worker's Compensation Insurance Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Employ
Fri 02/24 12:30 PM
Application to Employ Susan D Lasky, Esq. as Debtor's Attorney [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Case Management Summary
Fri 02/24 12:23 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
Wednesday, February 22, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Ch 11 Small Business Monthly Operating Report
Wed 02/22 3:57 PM
Monthly Operating Report for the Period Beginning January 27, 2017 and Ending Janaury 31, 2017 Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information Order
Mon 02/13 2:24 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules/Plan/Required Information. Deadline Extended through 2/24/2017. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/24/2017]. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/24/2017. Schedule A/B due 2/24/2017. Schedule D due 2/24/2017. Schedule E/F due 2/24/2017. Schedule G due 2/24/2017. Schedule H due 2/24/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/24/2017.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/24/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/24/2017. (Grooms, Desiree) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time to File Schedules / Plan / Required Information
Fri 02/10 1:25 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Extend Time to File Schedules, Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Sat 02/04 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Chapter 11 Small Business Statement of Unavailability of Documents
Fri 02/03 1:11 PM
Statement of Unavailability of Documents Required for Small Business Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC . (Lasky, Susan) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Tax Return Documents
Fri 02/03 1:04 PM
Federal Income Tax Return of Debtor. [ Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users ] Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 02/02 6:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by David B Marks Filed by Creditor Stonegate Bank. (Marks, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Thu 02/02 10:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Carl L Kitchner Filed by Creditor Broward County Records, Taxes, & Treasury. (Kitchner, Carl) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 02/02 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/01/2017. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Wed 02/01 7:34 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 2/27/2017 at 01:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 4/28/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 5/30/2017. (Grooms, Desiree) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 01/30 10:03 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 2/3/2017].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents due by 2/3/2017. List of Equity Security Holders due 2/10/2017. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/10/2017. Schedule A/B due 2/10/2017. Schedule D due 2/10/2017. Schedule E/F due 2/10/2017. Schedule G due 2/10/2017. Schedule H due 2/10/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/10/2017.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/10/2017. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/10/2017]. (Grooms, Desiree) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 01/27 4:10 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor New River Hospitality Holdings, LLC. (Lasky, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
12
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Fri 01/27 4:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Lasky, Susan) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 01/27 4:11 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11037 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29130789. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |