Haff Poultry, Inc. et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Oklahoma Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Shelby |
Referred: | Cecilia M Romero |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00033 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 28:1337 Sherman-Clayton Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 26, 2017 4:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
Tyson Chicken, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koch Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Koch Meat Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Perdue Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Pilgrim Pride Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanderson Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyson Poultry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyson Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyson Breeders, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
In Re
Broiler Chicken Grower Litigation
|
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myles B. Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Butler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnathan Walters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnny Upchurch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Haff Poultry, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Consol Plaintiff
Triple R Ranch, LLC
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Vince Edwards
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jonathan Buttram
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Matt Purlee
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Paul Brown
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
William Beatty
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Consol Plaintiff
Jeremy Souder
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Carr
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Craig Watts
Terminated: 07/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 01 2017
ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby GRANTING 144 Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motions to Dismiss. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) |
1. | Chicken farmers file lawsuit against Tyson and Perdue, alleges price collusion (abcnews.go.com) |
Submitted Fri 02/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
797 | 797
order
02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s)
Thu 03/07 1:00 PM
MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Robert J. Shelby: The court hereby continues the ZOOM Status Conference that was set on 3/15/24 at 2:00 p.m. CST (1:00 p.m. MST) TO 5/16/24 at 3:00 p.m. CST (2:00 p.m. MST). ZOOM instructions will be sent to the parties. (Associated Cases: 17-cv-33-RJS-CMR; 20-cv-478-RJS-CMR; 20-cv-479-RJS-CMR; 20-cv-480-RJS-CMR and 21-cv-33-RJS-CMR) (dma, Deputy Clerk) |