Prestige Industries LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | John T Dorsey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10186 |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Prestige Industries LLC
2101 91st St
North Bergen, NJ 07047-4731 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 01/29/2017 7:00 PM EST |
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
court
Case Assigned
Mon 01/30 10:40 AM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case.(AK) |
||
misc
Add Attorney
Mon 01/30 3:49 PM
Attorney Mark S. Kenney and Mark S. Kenney for U.S. Trustee added to case Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Kenney, Mark) |
||
1 | 1
22
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 01/30 10:25 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 01/30 10:27 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10186 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8321500, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration in Support
Mon 01/30 11:39 AM
Declaration in Support of First Day Motions Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 01/30 12:05 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice James M. Matour . Receipt Number 0311207452, Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion
Mon 01/30 12:08 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Erik L. Coccia . Receipt Number 0311207452, Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Reject Lease or Executory Contract - Motion
Mon 01/30 12:13 PM
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract of Bayshore NY Real Property Leaseand Any Amendments Thereto, Effective As Of The Petition Date Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service
Mon 01/30 1:26 PM
Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Deadline to File Schedules - Motion
Mon 01/30 1:40 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Mon 01/30 1:58 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions For entry of Interim and Finals Orders (I) Authorizing The Debtor To Maintain and Renew Prepetition Insurance Policies and Pay All Obligations In Respect Thereof and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
10 | 10
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Mon 01/30 4:48 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain Dilworth Paxson LLP as Attorney for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A | ||
11 | 11
motion
Chapter 11 First Day Motions
Mon 01/30 5:01 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions For Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
12 | 12
motion
Motion to Pay Employee Wages
Mon 01/30 5:34 PM
Motion to Pay Employee Wages Benefits and Expenses Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Form of Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts
Mon 01/30 6:11 PM
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts and Continued Use of its Existing Cash Management System Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
14 | 14
motion
Approve Debtor In Possession Financing - Motion
Mon 01/30 6:25 PM
Motion to Approve Debtor In Possession Financing Filed By Prestige Industries LLC(Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
15 | 15
motion
Employ/Retain - Application/Motion
Mon 01/30 6:48 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain SSG Advisors, LLC as Investment Banker Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Michael Goodman | ||
Att: 2 Schedule 1 | ||
Att: 3 Schedule 2 | ||
Att: 4 Schedule 3 | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Form of Order | ||
16 | 16
notice
Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice
Mon 01/30 7:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hughes, Peter) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Hearing - Notice
Mon 01/30 7:42 PM
Notice of Hearing (I) Filing of bankruptcy Petitions and Related Pleadings and (II) Hearing on First Day Motions Scheduled for February 1, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Prestige Industries LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/1/2017 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hughes, Peter) |