Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Suzanne H Bauknight
Case #: 3:17-bk-30236
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Pure Foods, Inc.
PO Box 6372
Kingsport, TN 37663-1372
Represented By
William L. Norton, III
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
800 Market Street, Suite 114 Howard H. Baker Jr. U.S. Courthouse
Knoxville, TN 37902


1. Health snack producer Pure Foods files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (timesnews.net)
Submitted Mon 02/13/2017
Docket last updated: 03/28/2017 12:05 PM EDT
Monday, March 27, 2017
166 166 court Hearing Set (BK) Mon 1:26 PM
Amended Hearing Set Related [+] Hearing rescheduled 4/6/2017 at 10:00 AM at Ctrm 1C Baker Crths Knoxville, TN. (hhc)
Related: [-] 124 Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by James D. Lane II on behalf of Creditor Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Saturday, March 25, 2017
165 165 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Sun 1:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 173. Notice Date 03/25/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 160 Order Approving Motion for Order Approving Stipulation Conferring Standing on The Official Committee of the Unsecured Creditors to bring certain causes of action of the estate. (Related Doc158 ) (mdt)
164 164 cmp Complaint Sat 8:13 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03006. Complaint by Committee of Unsecured Creditors against CoBank, ACB. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))(Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
163 163 cmp Complaint Sat 7:09 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03005. Complaint by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. against Belkorp Industries Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause))(Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5
Friday, March 24, 2017
162 162 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Sat 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 171. Notice Date 03/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 157 Order Granting Motion for Ex Parte Relief for Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 Directing Debtor to Produce Documents and Appear for Examination (Related Doc154 ) (mdt)
161 161 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket Sat 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/24/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 156 Memo re: adding creditors (RE: related document(s)151 Request to Add Creditor and Address to Matrix. Filed by William L. Norton III on behalf of Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.. (Norton, William) **Modified on 3/21/2017, to correct docket event** (rjs). filed by Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.) (mdt)
Thursday, March 23, 2017
160 160 order Order Acting on Motion for Ex Parte Relief Thu 1:29 PM
Order Approving Motion for Order Approving Stipulation Conferring Standing on The Official Committee of the Unsecured Creditors to bring certain causes of action of the estate. Related [+] (mdt)
Related: [-] 158
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
159 159 notice Notice (generic) Wed 2:50 PM
Notice Notice of Ex Parte Motion for Order Approving Stipulation Conferring Standing on the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Bring Certain Causes of Action of the Estate Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
158 158 motion Ex Parte Relief Wed 2:48 PM
Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: Ex Parte Motion for Order Approving Stipulation Conferring Standing on the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Bring Certain Causes of Action of the Estate Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Proposed Order
157 157 order Order Acting on Motion for Ex Parte Relief Wed 11:49 AM
Order Granting Motion for Ex Parte Relief for Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 Directing Debtor to Produce Documents and Appear for Examination Related [+] (mdt)
Related: [-] 154
156 156 court Memo Wed 10:25 AM
Memo re: adding creditors Related [+] (mdt)
Related: [-] 151 Request to Add Creditor and Address to Matrix. Filed by William L. Norton III on behalf of Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.. (Norton, William) **Modified on 3/21/2017, to correct docket event** (rjs). filed by Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
utility Corrective Entry Tue 2:55 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Modified on 3/21/2017, to correct docket event. (rjs). Related [+] (rjs)
Related: [-] 151 Request to Add Creditor and Address to Matrix. Filed by William L. Norton III on behalf of Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.. (Norton, William) filed by Debtor Pure Foods, Inc.
Monday, March 20, 2017
155 155 notice Notice (generic) Mon 11:41 PM
Notice Notice of Ex Parte Motion for Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 Directing Debtor to Produce Documents and Appear for Examination Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
154 154 motion Ex Parte Relief Mon 11:40 PM
Motion for Ex Parte Relief Re: Ex Parte Motion for Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 Directing Debtor to Produce Documents and Appear for Examination Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Clifford, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order