State of Washington, et al., v. Trump., et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00141 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 2:25 AM PDT |
Amicus
Washington State Labor Council
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Service Employees International Union
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Harry E. Ries
PO BOX 1849
MOSES LAKE, WA 98837 |
|
Amicus
New York University
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Law Professors
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Jewish Federation of Greater Seattle
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
International Law Scholars and Nongovernmental Organizations
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
City of Chicago
City of Chicago Department of Law, Appeals Division 30 N. LaSalle Street Suite 800
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Americans United for Separation of Church and State
|
Represented By
|
Amicus
American Center for Law & Justice
201 Maryland Avenue NE
Washington, DC 20002 |
|
Amicus
American Civil Liberties Union of Washington (ACLU)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rex Tillerson
|
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
State of Oregon
Intervenor-Plaintiff Department of Justice 100 SW Market Street
Portland, OR 97201 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of California
Office of the California AttorneY General 455 Golden Gate Avenue Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Attorney General of Maryland 200 St. Paul Place 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Washington
Office of the Attorney General 800 5th Avenue Suite 2000
Seattle, WA 98104 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of New York
New York State Office of the Attorney General Civil Rights Bureau 120 Broadway 23rd Floor
New York, NY 10271 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Amicus
Northern Cheyenne Nation
Terminated: 04/13/2017
NATIVE AMERICAN LAW & JUSTICE CENTER 5150 FAIR OAKS BLVD SUITE 101-256
CARMICHAEL, CA 95608 |
|
Amicus
Victor Williams
Terminated: 03/16/2017
America First Lawyers Association 5209 Baltimore Ave
Bethesda, MD 20816 |
|
Amicus
Yamassee Mund Bareefan Nation
Terminated: 04/13/2017
NATIVE AMERICAN LAW & JUSTICE CENTER 5150 FAIR OAKS BLVD SUITE 101-256
CARMICHAEL, CA 95608 |
|
Amicus
Washitaw Nation
Terminated: 04/13/2017
NATIVE AMERICAN LAW & JUSTICE CENTER 5150 FAIR OAKS BLVD SUITE 101-256
CARMICHAEL, CA 95608 |
|
Amicus
Sec Am Tek Tek Tribe
Terminated: 04/13/2017
NATIVE AMERICAN LAW & JUSTICE CENTER 5150 FAIR OAKS BLVD SUITE 101-256
CARMICHAEL, CA 95608 |
|
Defendant
Tom Shannon
Terminated: 03/16/2017
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Mikki the Mime
Terminated: 02/16/2017
P01102062 C/O JOSEPH A CAMP JEFFERSON COUNTY JAIL PO BOX 16700
GOLDEN, CO 80402 |
|
Intervenor Defendant
James J O'Hagan
Terminated: 02/14/2017
2298 CRANBERRY RD
GRAYLAND, WA 98547 |
|
Movant
Lamar C Chapman, III
Terminated: 05/17/2017
16900-424 LORETTO FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 1000
LORETTO, PA 15940 |
|
Movant
Ann Dawson
Terminated: 03/30/2017
732 S ANDREWS AVE
SHERMAN, TX 75090 |
|
Movant
Kareem Salessi
Terminated: 03/30/2017
DISCLOSURE REALTY COMPANY 2082 MICHELSON DRIVE #100
IRVINE, CA 92612 |
|
Movant
Rick Satcher
Terminated: 03/30/2017
PO BOX 1105
RAYMOND, WA 98577 |
|
Movant
David A Golden
Terminated: 03/30/2017
11826 N MAYFAIR RD #28
SPOKANE, WA 99218 |
|
Plaintiff
State of Minnesota
Terminated: 03/16/2017
Minnesota Attorney General Jacob Campion Assistant Attorney General 445 Minnesota Street, Suite 1100
St. Paul, MN 55101 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
217 | 217
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Party(s)
Fri 11/09 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) State of Maryland, State of New York, State of Oregon, Commonwealth of Massachusetts and State of California, filed by Plaintiff State of Oregon. (Kaplan, Scott) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 11/13 10:13 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. Per plaintiff's Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (Dkts.216 ,217 ). (SWT) |
||
Wednesday, November 07, 2018 | ||
utility
Notice of Docket Text Modification
Wed 11/07 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re Terminated Case : Text in entry closing out the case was stricken. (TH) |
||
Monday, November 05, 2018 | ||
216 | 216
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case)
Mon 11/05 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff State of Washington (Melody, Colleen) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 11/06 4:29 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. ( See plaintiffs'216 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (SWT) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Parties
Wed 11/07 10:29 AM
Party State of Washington terminated per216 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (TH) |