Atlantic Container Line AB, et al. v. Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle (s) Electric Power Turbine in 2 Parts: Control Room Trailer General., et al.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Richard D Bennett |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00264 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 6:27 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
PW Power Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle(s) Electric Power Turbine in 2 Parts: Control Room Trailer General
|
|
Cross Defendant
Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle (s) Turbine Trailer General
|
|
Cross Defendant
K Energy S.A.
|
|
Cross Defendant
Miami Capital Group Corp,
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Miami Capital Holding Corporation,
|
|
Cross Defendant
Miami Capital Inc K Energy
|
|
Defendant
Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle(s) Electric Power Turbine in 2 Parts: Control Room Trailer General
|
|
Defendant
Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle (s) Turbine Trailer General
|
|
Defendant
Miami Capital Inc K Energy
|
|
Defendant
Miami Capital Holding Corporation,
|
|
Defendant
Miami Capital Group Corp,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
K Energy S.A.
|
|
Defendant
PW Power Systems, Inc.
628 Hebron Avenue, Suite 400
Glastonbury, CT 06033 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Grimaldi Group
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Atlantic Container Line AB
50 Cardinal Drive
Westfield, NJ 07090 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 03/13 4:55 PM
ORDER GRANTING18 Motion to Dismiss; DIRECTING Miami Capital Group Corp. to reimburse plaintiff in the amount of $4213.76 by 5 pm 3/15/17; RELEASING PW Power Systems, Inc. as substitute custodian for the Res; RELEASING Res to Miami Capital Group Corp; PERMANENTLY ENJOINING K Energy, S.A., Ibrahim Kassis Dioubate from interfering with Miami Capital Group Corp.'s title to or possession of the Res; DISMISSING1 Complaint and24 PW Power Systems, Inc.'s crossclaims w/prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/13/2017. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
43 | 43
corresp
Miscellaneous
Mon 03/13 4:30 PM
Correspondence re: Order(Bourgeois, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
42 | 42
minutes
Motion Hearing
Mon 03/13 11:37 AM
Motion Hearing held on 3/13/2017 re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Miami Capital Group Corp, before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Douglas Zweizig) (J Herndon, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/02 5:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, re40 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion to Seal,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, (Heyer, Eric) |
|
40 | 40
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion to Show Cause Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Thu 03/02 4:30 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion of Miami Capital Group Corp for Preliminary Injunction; PW Power Systems, Inc. IS APPOINTED as substitute custodian of the interpleader property in place of Atlantic Container Line; granting28 Motion of PW Power Systems, Inc. to Adopt Miami Capital Groups Motion to Dismiss ; Interpleader Defendant Miami Capital Group Corps Motion to Dismiss18 is HELD IN ABEYANCE; granting36 Motion of PW Power Systems, Inc. to Seal34 - Exhibit 3; Defendant K Energy S.A. shall SHOW CAUSE before this Court at the United States District Court, District of Maryland, located at 101 W. Lombard Street,Baltimore, Maryland 21201 on the 13th day of March, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. EST. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/2/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Correspondence
Thu 03/02 4:12 PM
Correspondence from counsel re: ECF 35(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/02 3:10 PM
NOTICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,35 Motion Hearing,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER (Heyer, Eric) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/02 2:52 PM
NOTICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, OF EMAILS RECEIVED FROM IBRAHIM KASSIS DIOUBATE(Heyer, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Seal
Thu 03/02 1:58 PM
MOTION to Seal Unopposed Motion to Remove From Public View and Place Under Seal Exhibit 3 to Miami Capital's Reply Memorandum by PW Power Systems, Inc.(Lewis, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
35 | 35
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 03/02 11:51 AM
Motion Hearing held on 3/2/2017 re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miami Capital Group Corp,,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Miami Capital Group Corp, before Judge Richard D. Bennett.(Court Reporter: Douglas Zweizig-5D) (chs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/01 6:12 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Miami Capital Group Corp,.(Heyer, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (2.28.17 Dioubate Emails), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Miami Capital Holding Corp. Minutes), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Turbine Purchase Agreement) | ||
33 | 33
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 03/01 3:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Container Line AB, Grimaldi Group.(Green, Bryant) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/01 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Evelyn Lewis on behalf of PW Power Systems, Inc. (Lewis, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 02/28 4:09 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Maranda E Fritz. Directing attorney Maranda E Fritz to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 2/28/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk) |
|
30 | 30
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/28 12:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, re29 Order to Show Cause (Heyer, Eric) |
|
29 | 29
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 02/28 9:53 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/28/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/27 6:28 PM
MOTION Adoption of Motion to Dismiss re20 Affidavit,19 Memorandum,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PW Power Systems, Inc.(Bourgeois, John) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 02/27 5:47 PM
NOTICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER (Heyer, Eric) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/27 2:57 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Maranda E. Fritz (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6522809.) by Miami Capital Group Corp,(Heyer, Eric) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/27 2:37 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by PW Power Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd., Corporate Parent MPS-CT, LLC for PW Power Systems, Inc..(Bourgeois, John) |
|
24 | 24
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 02/27 11:41 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against K Energy S.A., Miami Capital Group Corp,, Miami Capital Holding Corporation,, Miami Capital Inc K Energy, Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle (s) Turbine Trailer General, Tangible Personal Property known as Used Unpacked Vehicle(s) Electric Power Turbine in 2 Parts: Control Room Trailer General by PW Power Systems, Inc..(Bourgeois, John) |
|
23 | 23
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 02/27 11:00 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Miami Capital Group Corp, re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ,22 Memorandum,20 Affidavit,19 Memorandum,18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (SUPPLEMENTAL) (Heyer, Eric) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 02/28 9:39 AM
Telephone Status Conference held on 2/27/2017 before Judge Richard D. Bennett. (Not on the record) (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Memorandum
Fri 02/24 6:04 PM
Memorandum re21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Miami Capital Group Corp,.(Heyer, Eric) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Show Cause Preliminary Injunction
Fri 02/24 6:04 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Miami Capital Group Corp,(Heyer, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Fri 02/24 5:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT re19 Memorandum of Sam Zormati by Miami Capital Group Corp,(Heyer, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 (Supreme Court of Guinea, Court of Appeals Ruling), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (Certificate of Non-Appeal and Non-Opposition), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 (Arrest Warrant), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 (Treaty on the Harmonization in Africa of Business Law) | ||
19 | 19
respm
Memorandum
Fri 02/24 5:29 PM
Memorandum re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Miami Capital Group Corp,.(Heyer, Eric) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 02/24 5:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Miami Capital Group Corp,(Heyer, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/23 5:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Nathan Heyer on behalf of Miami Capital Group Corp, (Heyer, Eric) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/16 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ezra Gollogly on behalf of PW Power Systems, Inc. (Gollogly, Ezra) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/16 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Augustine Bourgeois on behalf of PW Power Systems, Inc. (Bourgeois, John) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian
Tue 02/14 2:16 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/14/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 02/14 1:12 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Deposit Tangible Personal Property with the Court by Atlantic Container Line AB, Grimaldi Group. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/14/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appoint Custodian
Mon 02/13 4:42 PM
MOTION to Appoint Custodian by Atlantic Container Line AB, Grimaldi Group(Green, Bryant) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 02/13 4:41 PM
MOTION to Deposit Tangible Personal Property with the Court by Atlantic Container Line AB, Grimaldi Group(Green, Bryant) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 02/13 9:57 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grimaldi Group, Atlantic Container Line AB. PW Power Systems, Inc. served on 2/7/2017, answer due 2/28/2017.(O Brien, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Other Relief
Tue 02/07 1:46 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion to make service by other means. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/7/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Other Relief
Mon 02/06 3:47 PM
MOTION for Other Relief /to Make Service by Other Means Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(f)(3) by Atlantic Container Line AB, Grimaldi Group(O Brien, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/02 3:24 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to K Energy S.A., Miami Capital Group Corp.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Atlantic Container Line AB /Writ of Summons as to Defendant, Miami Capital Group Corp. (O Brien, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 2:27 PM
NOTICE by Atlantic Container Line AB /Writ of Summons as to Defendant, K-Energy SA (O Brien, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/02 2:26 PM
NOTICE by Atlantic Container Line AB /Writ of Summons as to Defendant, K Energy SA (O Brien, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 4:12 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to PW Power Systems, Inc.(slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/31 3:12 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Container Line AB identifying Other Affiliate Grimaldi Group for Atlantic Container Line AB.(O Brien, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/31 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against defendants, filed by Atlantic Container Line AB and Grimaldi Group.(O Brien, Robert) Modified on 1/31/2017 (slss, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Writ of Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 |