McMahan v. Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC et al
Kentucky Western District Court | |
Judge: | Greg N Stivers |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2017 5:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
Byrider Finance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alicia McMahan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 10/10 8:17 AM
USCA Case Number 17-6176 for17 Notice of Appeal. (Antoinette Macon, Case Manager) (CDR) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 10/05 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Stay,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Leave to, by Alicia McMahan. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0644-2521279. (Lawson, James) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Leave to
Thu 09/14 5:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 9/14/2017. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (DN14 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (DN10 ) is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (DN5 ) is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the active docket. cc: Counsel (CDR) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 04/26 4:10 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION for Leave to filed by Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC. (Tyson, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Leave to
Mon 04/10 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to by Plaintiff Alicia McMahan (Lawson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Sur-Reply, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Tendered Sur-Reply | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/27 3:38 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint filed by Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC. (Tyson, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 03/27 3:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC. (Tyson, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 4 - Declaration | ||
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 03/13 1:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Stay filed by Alicia McMahan. (Lawson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying MTC Arbitration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit RIC | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend/Correct
Mon 03/13 1:25 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint by Plaintiff Alicia McMahan (Lawson, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File 1st Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint | ||
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 03/01 2:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Greg N. Stivers on 3/1/2017 granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Tyson. cc: Counsel(DAK) |
|
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/24 11:49 AM
MOTION for Mark H. tyson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2391403.by Defendants Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC (Thompson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark H. Tyson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from The Supreme Court of Mississippi, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Pro Hac Vice Admission | ||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Order
Thu 02/23 2:54 PM
|
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation
Thu 02/23 2:53 PM
Proposed Order re5 by Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC. (Thompson, David) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Compel Dismiss Stay
Thu 02/23 2:34 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Defendants Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC (Thompson, David) (JBM). Added MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Stay on 2/23/2017 (JBM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jeffrey B. Higgins, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Bankruptcy Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Order of Discharge | ||
Att: 4 (2/23/2017) Proposed Order | ||
utility
Docket Correction
Thu 02/23 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re5 MOTION to Compel Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration : (1) The Efiler only selected the motion relief "compel" when there were multiple reliefs contained. The Clerk has modified the entry to include the additional reliefs "dismiss" and "Stay." (2) The proposed order was filed as a separate entry instead of as an attachment to the motion. The Clerk has taken the proposed order at DN6 and attached it to the motion. (3) The Efiler inadvertently filed the proposed order separately a second time. The Clerk has removed DN 7 from the record. Please see5 for complete viewing of the motion and proposed order. (JBM) |
||
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 02/21 11:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Thompson on behalf of Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC (Thompson, David) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 5:22 PM
Summonses Issued as to Byrider Finance, LLC, Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Case Assignment
Tue 01/31 5:21 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin. (JWM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/31 5:20 PM
COMPLAINT against Byrider Sales of Indiana S, LLC and Byrider Finance, LLC, filed by Alicia McMahan. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2376710. (JWM) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |