JTH Tax, Inc. v. Cogliandolo et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rebecca Beach Smith |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00067 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2017 5:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
ABJ Tax Services, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Roy Cogliandolo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JTH Tax, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/05 4:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JTH Tax, Inc.. (McWilliams, O'Kelly) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/05 1:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction ,6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in NORFOLK MAGISTRATE COURTROOM 2 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (afor) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 06/07 12:30 PM
Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing re6 and12 reset for 7/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 w/OCR before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/06 6:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Burns, Patrick) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 05/01 1:36 PM
ORDER granting37 Consent MOTION for Extension Of Time To Notice Hearing For Temporary Restraining Order And Motion To Dismiss by JTH Tax, Inc. Upon agreement of the Parties, it is ORDERED, that the Parties' Motion is granted; and it is FURTHER ORDERED, the Parties are granted an extension of time to notice the hearings for the Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Dismiss to June 1, 2017. Copy of Order provided to all parties.Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 5/1/2017. (bgra) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 04/28 9:28 AM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Lawrence R. Leonard.37 Consent MOTION for Extension Of Time To Notice Hearing For Temporary Restraining Order And Motion To Dismiss (bgra) |
||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
respoth
Memorandum
Thu 04/27 3:35 PM
Memorandum In Support Of Consent Motion For Extension Of Time To Notice Hearing For Temporary Restraining Order And Motion To Dismiss to37 Consent MOTION for Extension Of Time To Notice Hearing For Temporary Restraining Order And Motion To Dismiss filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Burns, Patrick) |
|
37 | 37
motion
Extension of
Thu 04/27 3:28 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension Of Time To Notice Hearing For Temporary Restraining Order And Motion To Dismiss by JTH Tax, Inc..(Burns, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Supporting Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 03/28 4:58 PM
ORDER granting35 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearings on Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Dismiss. ORDERED, that the Motion to Continue the hearings scheduled for March 29, 2017 is GRANTED. The parties are directed to reschedule the hearing, no later than thirty days from the date of this Order, if they are not able to settle this case. Signed and entered as modified by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 3/28/2017. (bgra) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Continue
Tue 03/28 4:07 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Hearings on Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Dismiss by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
misc
Affidavit
Mon 03/27 8:42 AM
AFFIDAVIT re32 Order on Motion to Strike,,14 Opposition, of Roy Cogliandolo in Support of Defendants' Motion in Opposition of Emergency Relief by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Affidavit
Mon 03/27 8:40 AM
AFFIDAVIT re32 Order on Motion to Strike,,13 Memorandum in Support, of Roy Cogliandolo in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/24 9:35 AM
RESET: Motion Hearing re6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and12 Motion to Dismiss reset for 3/29/2017 at 11:30 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1w/OCR before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo) |
||
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Strike
Fri 03/17 1:20 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Strike. The Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED. Because they do not substantially comply with § 1746, the Affidavit ofRoy Cogliandolo in Support of Defendants' Motion in Opposition of Emergency Relief, ECF No. 14-1, and the Affidavit of Cogliandolo Tax Services in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 13-1, are STRICKEN. The Defendants are NOTIFIED that they may file replacement affidavits curing the deficiencies by March 27, 2017. Copy of Order provided to counsel for the parties. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 3/17/2017. (bgra, ) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/17 1:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (afor) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Referral Order
Fri 03/17 9:24 AM
REFERRAL ORDER: It is ORDERED that United States Magistrate Lawrence R. Leonard is designated to conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, if necessary, and to submit to the undersigned district judge proposed findings of fact, if applicable, and recommendations for the disposition of the Motion to Dismiss. The magistrate judge shall file his report of proposed findings and recommendations with the court, and the Clerk shall forthwith mail copies to all parties or their counsel. re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. Copy of Order provided to all parties of record. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 3/16/2017. (bgra) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 03/15 3:27 PM
Withdrawal of Document by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC re27 Opposition, (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 03/15 3:24 PM
Withdrawal of Document by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC re26 Memorandum in Support (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/15 11:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing RESET for 3/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (afor) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 03/03 4:46 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. (McWilliams, O'Kelly) |
|
27 | 27
respoth
Opposition
Fri 03/03 10:37 AM
Opposition to6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order ,14 Opposition, (Supplemental Opposition) filed by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
26 | 26
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 03/03 10:36 AM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 03/03 11:32 AM
Notice of Correction: Attorney notified that leave of court is needed to file the Supplemental Opposition re27 Opposition6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,14 Opposition, (Supplemental Opposition.) (bgra) |
||
misc
Notice of Correction
Fri 03/03 11:41 AM
Notice of Correction: Attorney notified that leave of court is needed to file the Supplemental Memorandum in Suppoert re26 Memorandum in Support (Supplemental) re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (bgra) |
||
Thursday, March 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Request for Hearing
Thu 03/02 2:49 PM
Request for Hearing by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 02/27 5:17 PM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Strike14 Opposition, filed by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Burns, Patrick) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Strike
Mon 02/27 5:13 PM
MOTION to Strike14 Opposition, by JTH Tax, Inc..(Burns, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 02/24 4:18 PM
Motion Hearing re6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 3/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Mag Courtroom 1 w/OCR before Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (lwoo) |
||
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respoth
Reply Other
Thu 02/23 11:14 PM
Reply to14 Opposition, To Motion For Temporary Restraining Order filed by JTH Tax, Inc..(Burns, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 02/23 7:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Roy Cogliandolo.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Tuesday, February 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 02/21 6:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JTH Tax, Inc. as to Roy Cogliandolo served on 2/1/2017; Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC served on 2/2/2017. (bgra) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Reissued
Tue 02/21 3:12 PM
Summons Reissued as to ABJ Tax Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically reissued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
18 | 18
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 02/21 2:33 PM
Proposed Summons by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Burns, Patrick) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 02/21 12:49 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Pro hac vice for Brett Michael Dieck as to Roy Cogliandolo and Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/21/17. (tlev, ) |
|
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/20 7:54 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett Michael Dieck and Certification of Local Counsel Kenneth M. Misken Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5388188. by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/17 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Misken on behalf of Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC (Misken, Kenneth) |
|
14 | 14
respoth
Opposition
Fri 02/17 2:43 PM
Opposition to6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Part 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B Part 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B Part 3, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 02/17 2:34 PM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Fri 02/17 2:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC.(Misken, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations
Tue 02/07 3:01 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) (1) (B) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b), it is ORDERED that United States Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard, is designated to conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, if necessary, and to submit to the undersigned district judge proposed findings of fact, if applicable, and recommendations for the disposition of the Motion. The magistrate judge shall file his report of proposed findings and recommendations with the court, and the Clerk shall forthwith mail copies to all parties or their counsel. re6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Copy of Order sent to Plaintiff via CM/ECF notification and mailed to Defendants at address provided for service. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/7/2017. (bgra) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Mon 02/06 2:33 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Peter G. Siachos as to JTH Tax, Inc. Signed by Chief District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith on 2/6/17. (tlev, ) |
|
Friday, February 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 02/03 10:51 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter G. Siachos and Certification of Local Counsel Patrick K. Burns Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5365173. by JTH Tax, Inc.. (Burns, Patrick) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Request for Hearing
Fri 02/03 6:21 PM
Request for Hearing by JTH Tax, Inc. on Temporary Restraining Order Motion (Burns, Patrick) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 02/03 6:12 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by JTH Tax, Inc..(Burns, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
6 | 6
motion
Temporary Restraining Order
Fri 02/03 5:58 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JTH Tax, Inc..(Burns, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 3:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Roy Cogliandolo. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 3:51 PM
Summons Issued as to ABJ Tax Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Monday, January 30, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Tue 01/31 3:41 PM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by JTH Tax, Inc. (epri) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/31 3:40 PM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT against ABJ Tax Services, LLC, Roy Cogliandolo, Cogliandolo Tax Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5354959.), filed by JTH Tax, Inc.(epri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet |