BEH Gaming, Ltd. et al v. Schmockel et al
Montana District Court | |
Judge: | Brian Morris |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00008 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | Indian Gaming Regulatory Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2017 3:14 AM MDT |
Defendant
Carter Coffee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Misty Denny
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tim Rosette, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Caryn Sangrey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tanya Schmockel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BEH Gaming, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORAM, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NORAM-BEH, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/10 4:08 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Upon review of the Parties'23 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice, and good cause appearing therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/10/2017. (SLR) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stipulation Motion - MT
Fri 04/07 1:04 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC. (Quinlan, Jori) Modified on 4/7/2017 to change event into stipulated motion (MMS) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT
Mon 04/03 9:51 AM
ORDER: Upon review of the Plaintiffs'21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants'18 Motion to Dismiss, and good cause appearing thereby; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs BEH Gaming Ltd., NORAM-BEH, LLC; and, NORAM, LLC, have until May 3, 2017 to file their response to Defendant's18 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/3/2017. (SLR) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 03/31 1:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Mootness Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM
Wed 03/22 4:03 PM
ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Mootness : Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/22/2017. (MMS) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
Wed 03/15 4:09 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Mootness filed by Carter Coffee, Misty Denny, Tim Rosette, Jr, Caryn Sangrey, Tanya Schmockel. (Davis, Maxon) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM
Wed 03/15 4:08 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Mootness Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants Carter Coffee, Misty Denny, Tim Rosette, Jr, Caryn Sangrey, Tanya Schmockel (Davis, Maxon) |
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM
Mon 03/06 7:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. Answer to Complaint due 3/15/17 per17 Stipulation of parties. (SLR) |
||
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Fri 03/03 5:33 PM
STIPULATION to Extending Time to Respond by Carter Coffee, Misty Denny, Tim Rosette, Jr, Caryn Sangrey, Tanya Schmockel. (Davis, Maxon) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT
Tue 02/14 4:23 PM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by NORAM-BEH, LLC re9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Peterson, Joshua) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT
Tue 02/14 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by NORAM-BEH, LLC re9 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, (Miranowski, Jerome) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 02/13 10:29 AM
Remark: Joshua Peterson is now a registered CM/ECF user. (MMS) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 02/08 2:13 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Vacate. The hearing scheduled for 2/9/2017 is VACATED and the Clerk is ordered the make the docket reflect that the motion for a temporary restraining order1 has been withdrawn. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/8/2017. (MMS) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Vacate
Wed 02/08 11:44 AM
MOTION to Vacate MOTION TO VACATE TRO HEARING AND WITHDRAW MOTION FOR TRO Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 02/06 1:34 PM
Remark: Jerome A. Miranowski is now a registered CM/ECF user. (SLR) |
||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 02/01 3:28 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM-BEH, LLC, and NORAM, LLC ("Plaintiffs") have moved this Court for an1 Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction against Defendants Schmockel, Sangrey, Denny, Coffee, and Rosette, Jr. ("Defendants") in their capacities as Commissioners of the Chippewa Cree Tribal Gaming Commission. Plaintiffs request that the Court restrain Defendants from conducting a hearing scheduled for the morning of February 2, 2017 in Box Elder, Montana. Plaintiffs also request that the Court restrain the Defendants from taking any other action with respect to the Complaint at issue in the February 2 hearing until this Court conducts a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Finally, Plaintiffs request that the Court restrain Defendants from issuing any order or taking any action with respect to the Plaintiffs. The Court issued an5 Order scheduling a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion on Thursday, February 9, 2017 at 2 p.m. Plaintiffs filed a6 motion seeking clarification on the scheduling order. The Court declines to take any other action at this time. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Court will consider any remaining issues regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction at the hearing scheduled for February 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/1/2017. (SLR) Modified on 2/1/2017 to create links. (SLR) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Wed 02/01 2:43 PM
Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court to PHV Counsel Joshua Peterson, re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Peterson. (ACC) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Wed 02/01 2:42 PM
Letter from Tyler P. Gilman, Clerk of Court to PHV Counsel Jerome Miranowski, re CM/ECF registration. Letter mailed to Counsel Miranowski. (ACC) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT
Wed 02/01 12:32 PM
ORDER re7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Plaintiffs' motions to allow Mr. Miranowski and Mr. Peterson to appear on its behalf are GRANTED, subject to conditions - see order. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/16/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/1/2017. (ACC) Modified on 2/1/2017 to reflect copy of order mailed to Cnsl Miranowski & Cnsl Peterson (ACC) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT
Wed 02/01 11:26 AM
MOTION Joshua T. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1900087.) Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Joshua T. Peterson, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT
Wed 02/01 11:17 AM
MOTION Jerome A. Miranowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-1900083.) Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Jerome A. Miranowski, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Clarify - MT Temporary Restraining Order
Wed 02/01 10:38 AM
MOTION to Clarify , Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM
Wed 02/01 10:07 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs'1 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on Thursday, February 9, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/1/2017. (SLR) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 4:14 PM
Summonses Issued as to All Defendants. Originals mailed to cnsl King and Quinlan (TLO) |
|
3 | 3
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint - SDM
Tue 01/31 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Carter Coffee, Misty Denny, Tim Rosette, Jr, Caryn Sangrey, Tanya Schmockel, filed by NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC, BEH Gaming, Ltd. (TLO) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Tribe's Gaming Ordinance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Turn-Key Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 Deposition of Daniel D. Belcourt, | ||
Att: 5 Exhbit 4 Bob Cloud's Complaint and Notice of Hearing, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Declaration and Report of Bob Cloud, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Tribe's Motion to Stay Case, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Plaintiffs' Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Second Complaint and Notice, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Plaintiffs' Request for Continuance, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 The Commission's Denial of Request for Continuance, | ||
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 13 Summons Tanya Schmockel, | ||
Att: 14 Summons Caryn Sangrey, | ||
Att: 15 Summons Misty Denny, | ||
Att: 16 Summons Carter Coffee, | ||
Att: 17 Summons Timothy Rosette, Jr., | ||
Att: 18 NORAM-BEH, LLC'S Corporate Disclosure, | ||
Att: 19 NORAM, LLC'S Corporate Disclosure, | ||
Att: 20 BEH GAMING, LTD Corporate Disclosure | ||
2 | 2
respm
Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT
Tue 01/31 3:37 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re1 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC. (Quinlan, Jori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Wells Fargo Bank NA v Maynahonah | ||
1 | 1
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Tue 01/31 3:34 PM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Jori Lydia Quinlan appearing for Plaintiffs BEH Gaming, Ltd., NORAM, LLC, NORAM-BEH, LLC (Quinlan, Jori) Modified on 1/31/2017 to reflect chambers was notified of motion (MMS) |
|
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 01/31 3:42 PM
Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-1899414 (TLO) |