Fantasy Aces LP
California Central Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Erithe A Smith |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-10359 |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2020 |
Debtor
Fantasy Aces LP
120 Vantis Dr Ste 300
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656-2677 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701 |
1. | Daily Fantasy Sports Operator Fantasy Aces Files For Bankruptcy (legalsportsreport.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/01/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 02/01/2017 12:03 AM PST |
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Tue 01/31 1:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:17-bk-10359) [misc,volp7] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 44140684. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) (Corp No POC)
Tue 01/31 1:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 03/14/2017 at 09:00 AM at RM 3-110, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. (Briones, Bert) |
||
1 | 1
90
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Tue 01/31 1:54 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $335 Filed by Fantasy Aces LP (Briones, Bert)WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #3. Case deficient re Corporation Resolution Authorize due 2/14/20167 Incomplete Filing due 2/14/2017. Modified on 1/31/2017 (Nguyen, Vi) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1)
Tue 01/31 1:55 PM
Electronic Filing Declaration (LBR Form F1002-1) Filed by Debtor Fantasy Aces LP. (Briones, Bert) |
|
3 | 3
court
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required
Tue 01/31 3:46 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: CORPORATION RESOLUTION AUTHORIZE IS MISSING FROM THE PETITION. THE PROPER DEFICIENCY HAS BEEN ISSUED. (Nguyen, Vi) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
misc
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (manual - ccdn) (BNC)
Tue 01/31 3:48 PM
Case Commencement Deficiency Notice (BNC) (Nguyen, Vi) |