Henderson v. Target Corporation et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | M James Lorenz |
Referred: | Mitchell D Dembin |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00185 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2017 1:20 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
|
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Katea Henderson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 10/03 2:45 PM
ORDER granting17 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/3/2017. (sjt) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Tue 10/03 11:07 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice by Target Corporation.(Schulz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Teleconference Information Sheet
Fri 09/22 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Teleconference set for 10/26/2017 at 9:15AM. (atk) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Fri 09/22 6:23 PM
Order Vacating Mandatory Settlement Conference and Scheduling telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference: On September 21, 2017, a Notice of Settlement was filed.13 . Accordingly, the Mandatory Settlement Conference scheduled for October 26, 2017, is VACATED. Further, a Joint Motion for Dismissal is due: October 25, 2017. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by October 25, 2017 then a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held October 26, 2017 at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Only counsel are required to participate. Counsel are instructed to use the dial-in information filed as a separate notice to access the Court's teleconference service. (The teleconference information sheet can be accessed through ECF using the login information assigned to an attorney of record in the case and then selecting the report option. On the next screen, the docket sheet option should be selected, prompting the user for a PACER login (assigned to the attorney of record). Once the PACER login is completed, the case number can be entered which will display the docket sheet for the above captioned case and allow the user to open the teleconference information sheet.) If a Joint Motion to Dismiss is filed prior to the SDC, the conference will be taken off calendar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 09/22/2017.(no document attached) (atk) |
|
14 | 14
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 09/22 11:18 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Accepting re13 Notice of Settlement, from Defendant Target Corporation. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(f): Joint notice missing Signature Certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/22/2017.(sjt) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 09/21 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Target Corporation(Schulz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 06/14 1:05 PM
NOTICE Signature Certification by Target Corporation re10 Joint MOTION Requesting Order for Physical Examination(Schulz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Wed 06/14 10:44 AM
ORDER granting10 Joint Motion Requesting Order for Physical Examination. See attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 06/14/2017. (atk) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous (Other 1)
Mon 06/12 4:14 PM
Joint MOTION Requesting Order for Physical Examination by Target Corporation.(Schulz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 04/13 11:30 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 10/26/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2018 11:00 AM before Judge M. James Lorenz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/12/2017.(sjt) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
Case Management Conference Early Neutral Evaluation Conference
Tue 04/11 4:05 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: An Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference was held on April 11, 2017. No settlement. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney J. Peter Bunnell).(Defendant Attorney Peter Schulz). (no document attached) (atk) |
|
Saturday, March 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Mon 03/06 1:18 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 4/11/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2017 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 3/4/2017.(sjt) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/09 11:32 AM
NOTICE to Federal Court of Filing in State Court by Target Corporation(Schulz, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order of Judge Transfer
Tue 02/07 10:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin for all further proceedings. The new case number is 17cv0185 L-MDD. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (fth) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 01/31 3:39 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (lrf) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Party With Financial Interest
Tue 01/31 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Target Corporation. No Parties With Financial Interest. (lrf) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 01/31 3:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Target Corporation. (lrf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 01/31 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2016 00041891-CU-PO-NC. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0974-9774388), filed by Target Corporation. The new case number is 3:17-cv-00185-L-NLS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(lrf) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Answer to Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Statement of Damages, | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service |