Holmquist et al v. United States
Washington Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas O Rice |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00046 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2017 1:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
G Maeve Aeolus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margie Heller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr Gunnar Holmquist
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lewis Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Nelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deena Romoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Taylor
|
Represented By
|
1. | Judge dismisses lawsuit filed by Raging Grannies to ban trains carrying fossil fuels (krem.com) |
Submitted Wed 07/19/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 07/14 5:01 PM
JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Defendant United States. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 07/14 4:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim ECF No.11 is GRANTED. The deadlines, hearings and trial date are VACATED. Each party to bear its own costs and expenses. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Transcript
Thu 07/13 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING. Proceedings held on 7-12-17 in SPOKANE before Judge THOMAS O RICE. Page Numbers: 1-38 Parties have seven (7) business days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court website at www.waed.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/transcript_policy_notice_20130215.pdf. To purchase a copy of the transcript contact Court Reporter/Transcriber MARK SNOVER at 5094583434 . Redaction Request due 8/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2017. (Snover, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 07/12 9:49 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2017. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply Memorandum
Tue 06/06 4:05 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by United States. (Orloff, Serena) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 05/09 4:26 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2017 at 09:00 AM Spokane Courtroom 902 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Schromen-Wawrin, Lindsey) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Mon 04/10 1:41 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion - By Court
Mon 04/10 1:38 PM
NOTICE RESETTING HEARING BY COURT. At the request of counsel, oral argument on11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim is set for 7/12/2017 at 9:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 902 before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than 5/9/2017; Defendants optional reply shall be filed no later than 6/6/2017. TEXT ONLY NOTICE; NO PDF WILL FOLLOW.(BF, Paralegal) |
|
12 | 12
motion
File Excess Pages
Mon 04/10 12:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , and Motion to Expedite, by G Maeve Aeolus, Margie Heller, Gunnar Holmquist, Lewis Nelson, Nancy Nelson, Deena Romoff, George Taylor. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2017 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Schromen-Wawrin, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 04/04 12:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by United States. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2017 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Orloff, Serena) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Fri 03/31 11:21 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Expedite
Fri 03/31 11:20 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. TEXT ONLY ORDER; NO PDF WILL ISSUE. (BF, Paralegal) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/31 8:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rudolf J Verschoor on behalf of United States (Attorney Rudolf J Verschoor added to party United States(pty:dft))(Verschoor, Rudolf) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Expedite
Thu 03/30 7:48 AM
Consent MOTION to Expedite Motion for Additional Pages by United States. Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2017 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Orloff, Serena) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 03/30 7:45 AM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by United States. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2017 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice.(Orloff, Serena) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 03/30 7:40 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Orloff on behalf of United States (Attorney Serena Maya Orloff added to party United States(pty:dft))(Orloff, Serena) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 01/31 1:50 PM
Summons Issued as to United States. (CV, Case Administrator) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 01/31 1:17 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by G. Maeve Aeolus, Margie Heller, Gunnar Holmquist, Lewis Nelson, Nancy Nelson, Deena Romoff, George Taylor. (Schromen-Wawrin, Lindsey) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 01/31 1:09 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-2533901) Jury Demand. Filed by George Taylor, Lewis Nelson, G. Maeve Aeolus, Nancy Nelson, Margie Heller, Gunnar Holmquist, Deena Romoff.(Schromen-Wawrin, Lindsey) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment 1, Initiative 2016-2, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 2, memo re Initiative 2016-2, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 3, memo re Initiative 2016-6 | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Tue 01/31 1:43 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (CV, Case Administrator) |