Women for Women, P.C.
Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Paul Baisier |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-51910 |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2018 |
Debtor
Women for Women, P.C.
PO Box 7608
Atlanta, GA 30357-0608 |
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 02/02/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Wed 02/01 7:44 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) for Non-Individual Fee $ 335, Filed by Evan M. Altman on behalf of Women for Women, P.C.. Government Proof of Claim due by 7/31/2017.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 03/3/2017 (Altman, Evan) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Autodocket of Credit Card
Wed 02/01 8:39 PM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-51910 [misc,1011aty] ( 335.00) filing fee. Receipt Number 43962757. Fee Amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |