Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc v. MIO Wholesale et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00830 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 31, 2017 1:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
MIO Wholesale
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Auditions Fashion, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Wholesale Fashion Square
Terminated: 04/06/2017
|
|
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 05/09/2017
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121)
Wed 12/13 9:55 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (mailed 12/13/17) (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 12/13 9:41 AM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION27 by Judge John F. Walter. THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1.The entire Action is dismissed with prejudice; and 2.All parties will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees incurred against one another in this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 12/12 6:23 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 08/23 11:17 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Auditions Fashion, Inc., identifying Auditions Fashion, Inc. and Universal Dyeing & Printing, Inc.. (Myung, Soohyun) |
|
25 | 25
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/23 11:16 AM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition21 filed by Defendant Auditions Fashion, Inc..(Attorney Soohyun Calvin Myung added to party Auditions Fashion, Inc.(pty:dft))(Myung, Soohyun) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 08/10 5:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc, upon Defendant Auditions Fashion, Inc. served on 8/10/2017, answer due 8/31/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sang Jin Park, Agent for Service c/o Eunyoung Cha, Person Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/26 9:59 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint21 as to defendants Auditions Fashion, Inc., MIO Wholesale. (jp) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/25 5:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition21 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
21 | 21
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Tue 07/25 5:39 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, MIO Wholesale, Auditions Fashion, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order
Tue 07/25 4:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint19 by Judge John F. Walter that the proposed First Amended Complaint lodged concurrently with the parties Stipulation to Allow Filing of First Amended Complaint as Exhibit 1 shall be file by plaintiff immediately. Defendants may file amended Answers within ten (10) days of the date of Plaintiff filing its First Amended Complaint. If no amended answers are filed, the original answer will be deemed the Answer to the First Amended Complaint. **Note to counsel: Failure to submit proposed orders in the future will result in the striking of the request.** (jp) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Amend/Correct
Wed 07/12 1:10 PM
STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.(Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/09 4:07 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. (jp) |
|
17 | 17
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 05/09 3:45 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on May 15, 2017 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 12/5/2017. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: 12/12/2017. (jp) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 05/08 4:38 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 court days, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc.. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 04/25 2:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for 5/15/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference.Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 5/8/2017. (jp) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 04/25 2:28 PM
STANDING ORDER. This action has been assigned to the calendar of JudgeJohn F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Mon 04/24 2:32 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:17-cv-00830 JFW(SKx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))
Thu 04/06 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Wholesale Fashion Square. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/05 11:28 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MIO Wholesale, (Prince, Miles) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 04/05 11:20 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant MIO Wholesale.(Attorney Miles L Prince added to party MIO Wholesale (pty:dft))(Prince, Miles) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Wed 03/15 11:44 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing and Printing Inc, upon Defendant Wholesale Fashion Square served on 3/9/2017, answer due 3/30/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joy Jimenez, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Tue 03/07 11:34 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, February 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 02/02 3:49 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants MIO Wholesale, Wholesale Fashion Square. (et) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Thu 02/02 3:47 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (et) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C Statement of Consent | ||
Wednesday, February 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121)
Wed 02/01 5:26 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 02/01 5:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 02/01 5:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 02/01 5:25 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc, (Doniger, Stephen) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 02/01 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19292984 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Universal Dyeing & Printing Inc(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) |