Dehen v. Doe et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Larry Alan Burns |
Referred: | William V Gallo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1331as Fed. Question: Assault, Libel, Slander |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 31, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Twitter, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
University of San Diego
|
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Dehen
1804 Garnet Avenue, #239
Pacific Beach, CA 92109 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
91 | 91
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/19 1:56 PM
ORDER Granting90 Motion to Dismiss. Claims against John Does 1-100 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/19/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) |
|
Friday, November 16, 2018 | ||
90 | 90
motion
Dismiss
Mon 11/19 11:15 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Tiffany Dehen. (acc) |
|
89 | 89
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Mon 11/19 11:14 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Larry Alan Burns Accepting Document90 : Motion to Dismiss, from Plaintiff Tiffany Dehen. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Civ.L. Rule 5.2 - Missing Proof of Service. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/16/2018.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) |