Eastern Star Baptist Church
Arkansas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Ben T Barry |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-10643 |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Dismissed: | May 15, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Eastern Star Baptist Church
2701 E 2nd St
North Little Rock, AR 72114-6232 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee (ust)
Office Of U. S. Trustee 200 W Capitol, Ste. 1200
Little Rock, AR 72201 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 12:01 PM CDT |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
75 | 75
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 06/15 12:31 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. The Trustee Has Performed All Duties Required and is Discharged From and Relieved of His Trust. (Robinson, Annette) |