Jackie Fitzhenry-Russell et al v. Keurig Dr Pepper Inc., et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Nathanael M Cousins |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00564 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court, County of Santa Cruz, 16CV03345 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 02, 2017 2:36 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dr Pepper Snapple Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Canada Dry Mott's Inc.
|
|
Defendant
DOES 1-50
|
|
Plaintiff
Robin Dale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jackie Fitzhenry-Russell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arash Hashemi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Natasha Safaradi
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Dr Pepper/Seven Up, Inc.
Terminated: 05/10/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Gilburt
Terminated: 07/20/2017
|
Represented By
|