EO Liquidating, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10243 |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jun 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
EO Liquidating, LLC
160 Corporate Court
Meriden, CT 06450 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
Eastern Outfitters, LLC
160 Corporate Ct
Meriden, CT 06450-7177 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:14 PM EST |
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245 |
Represented By
|
Consultant
Malfitano Advisors, LLC
|
|
Creditor
Kimco Landlords
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Massachusetts Electric Company, Narragansett Electric Company, Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation and Jersey Central Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Market Street Retail South LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Manchester CP, LLC
300 Third Avenue Suite 2
Waltham, MA 02451 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Main Street at Exton, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Macerich Company
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation, as Agent to Somerset County Shopping Center
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Nike USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jersey Central Power & Light Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
2-8 Haven Avenue, Suite 220
Port Washington, NY 11050 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Shoppes at Wilton, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GGP Limited Partnership
Kristen N. Pate 110 North Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Franklin Shoppers Fair, Inc.
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fidelity Totowa Associates, LLC
Bayard PA 222 Delaware Avenue 9th Floor PO Box 25130
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fidelity-Totowa Associates, L.L.C. and Slater-Springfield Partners, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PGIM Real Estate
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PNC Bank, National Association, in its capacity as Agent
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PREIT Services, LLC, as agent for Moorestown Mall, LLC
Kurtzman | Steady, LLC 401 S. 2nd Street, Suite 200
Philadelphia, PA 19147 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pacific Retail Partners
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patchogue Realty Associates, LLC
Rosenthal, Monhait & Goddess, P.A. 919 N. Market Street, Suite 1401
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Providence Town Center Limited Partnership d/b/a PTC Providence Town Center Limited Partnership
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Public Service Electric and Gas Company, Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation, Yankee Gas Services Company, Boston Gas Company, Colonial Gas Company, KeySpan Gas East Corporation,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pyramid Management Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Taylor Saugus Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Regency Centers Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shoppes at Bedford 15A, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stuyvesant Plaza, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
State of CT Department of Revenue Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stoneham Milford, LLC
4650 North Port Washington Road
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Century Partners, LP
255 River Street 5th Floor
Troy, NY 12180 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Avon Marketplace Investors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Baltimore Gas and Electric Company, The Connecticut Light and Power Company, New York State Electric and Gas Corporation, PECO Energy Company, Public Service Company of New Hampshire,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
W/S Hadley Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Washington Prime Group Inc.
3300 Great American Tower 301 E. Fourth Street Attn: Ronald Gold and A.J. Webb
Cincinnati, OH 45202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Waste Management And Its Subsidiary and Affiliated Entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Valley Square Owner, LLC
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
CCW Retail-Portsmouth, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Bialson, Bergen & Schwab, P.C. 633 Menlo Ave Suite 100
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
COR Route 5 Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
Ansonia Finance Station PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023 |
|
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue
Cresskill, NJ 07626 |
|
Creditor
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carousel Center Company, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Charles River Realty
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chop Acquisition LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Life Insurance Company of North America, Cigna Life Insurance Company of New York and Cigna Behavioral Health, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Turnpike Shopping Center, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
300 Needham Street, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
D'Angelo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DDR Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
E&A/I&G Simsbury Commons LP
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
145 Great Road, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eastchester Associates Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Eddy Plaza Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wolverine World Wide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Equity One, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Eastern Outfitters, LLC, et al.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America, for the benefit of its Separate Real Estate Account
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Vantiv, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Estate of Gregory Bithell
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Trader Joe's East, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TLG Newington, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Antoinette Young, Esq.
|
|
Interested Party
Karen Snyder
|
|
Interested Party
Redstone Maintenance Service, LLC
|
|
Interested Party
Realty Income Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pittsford Plaza SPE, LLC
1265 Scottsville Road
Rochester, NY 14624 |
|
Interested Party
Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC and Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Commercial Asset Preservation, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sportsdirect.com Retail Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CLF Bob's Randolph, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CBRE, Inc.
White and Williams LLP 600 N. King St Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Renie Bithell
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
American Outdoor Brands, Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Cole Schotz P.C.
500 Delaware Avenue Suite 1410
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Bracewell LLP
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Lincoln Partners Advisors LLC
|
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Other Prof.
AP Services, LLC
Terminated: 04/05/2017
|
1. | Eastern Outfitters files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy amidst growing trouble in sports retail (wsj.com) |
Submitted Mon 02/06/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |