BS Liquidating, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10243
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10243
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10248 |
Case Filed: | Feb 05, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Bob's Stores, LLC
160 Corporate Ct
Meriden, CT 06450-7177 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 49 seconds ago |
Monday, July 15, 2019 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 07/15 2:11 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (NAB) |
||
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Case - Claims Agent
Wed 07/03 1:01 PM
Order Dismissing Case The Chapter 11 Cases. Signed on 6/28/2019 Tickle due by: 7/17/2019. (NAB) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 04/05 11:06 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. of Bob's Stores, LLC. Filed by Bob's Stores, LLC. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Schedules/Statements
Wed 04/05 11:03 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. of Bob's Stores, LLC. Filed by Bob's Stores, LLC. (Earle, Katharina) |
|
Sunday, March 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
claims
Request for Service of Notices
Sun 03/05 7:32 AM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by Synchrony Bank. (Smith, Valerie) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order-Joint Admin
Wed 02/08 4:13 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 11 Cases for Procedural Purpose Only. An Order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration of the Chapter 11 cases of: Eastern Outfitters, LLC: Subortis Retail Financing, LLC; Eastern Mountain Sports, LLC; Subortis IP Holdings, LLC; Bob's Stores, LLC; and Bob's/EMS Gift Card, LLC. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Eastern Outfitters, LLC Case No. 17-10243 (LSS) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Order Signed on 2/8/2017. (NAB) |
|
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Appearance - Notice
Mon 02/06 1:46 PM
Notice of Appearance. The party has consented to electronic service. Filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
court
Case Reassigned
Mon 02/06 12:10 PM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case. Involvement of Judge Kevin J. Carey Terminated (BA) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 02/06 7:59 AM
Judge Kevin J. Carey added to case.(SG) |
||
Sunday, February 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Sun 02/05 11:47 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-10248 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8331099, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
21
pgs
misc
RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Sun 02/05 11:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition of Bob's Stores, LLC . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Bob's Stores, LLC. (Pernick, Norman) |