Femy Drug Corporation
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Laurel M Isicoff |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11449 |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 17, 2018 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | May 05, 2017 |
Debtor
Femy Drug Corporation
8520 SW 133rd Ave # 423
Miami, FL 33183-4173 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ross R Hartog
9130 S Dadeland Blvd # 1800
Miami, FL 33156 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 02/06/2017 12:02 PM EST |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 02/06 11:50 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11449 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29187683. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Mon 02/06 11:48 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Angueira, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset)
Mon 02/06 11:54 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 03/06/2017 at 11:00 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. (Angueira, Robert) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 02/06 11:56 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Femy Drug Corporation. (Angueira, Robert) |
|
4 | 4
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Mon 02/06 11:57 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Robert A Angueira. (Angueira, Robert) |