Quantum Entertainment, LLC
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Wendelin I Lipp |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-11601 |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 19, 2019 |
Debtor
Quantum Entertainment, LLC
5005 Jackson St
Hyattsville, MD 20781-1042 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Laura J. Margulies
Laura Margulies & Associates, LLC 6205 Executive Blvd.
Rockville, MD 20852 |
Docket last updated: 02/06/2017 4:03 PM EST |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
court
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7
Mon 02/06 3:49 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Laura J. Margulies, with 341(a) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Mon 02/06 3:48 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Quantum Entertainment, LLC. (Gilman, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
Mon 02/06 3:48 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Richard L. Gilman. (Gilman, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/06 3:49 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11601 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 30062915. Fee amount 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |