Richardson v. Marsack et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam R Cummings |
Referred: | Paul D Stickney |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00343 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2017 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
County of Dallas
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe 1-5
|
|
Defendant
John Doe 1-5
|
|
Defendant
Darren Marsack
|
|
Plaintiff
Scott Damon Richardson, Sr
317 E Daugherty
Garland, TX 75041 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
appeal
USCA Order
Mon 10/23 5:37 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed pursuant to appellant's motion. (axm) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 10/03 9:59 AM
ORDER RE: NON-PRISONER'S IFP STATUS ON APPEAL: Plaintiff filed a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal and a motion for access to Pacer. (ECF No.18 ). The Court FINDS that the appeal is not taken in good faith and that Plaintiff' in forma pauperis status is WITHDRAWN. To the extent Plaintiff seeks free access to Pacer, the motion is DENIED. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 10/3/2017) (ran) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Tue 10/03 10:00 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:19. Tue Oct 3 10:00:14 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Tue 10/03 10:18 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-10857 : transmitted to Scott Damon Richardson, Sr on disk only by hand delivery. (axm) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/28 4:58 PM
MOTION for Pacer and Case Certified, filed by Scott Damon Richardson Sr. (ran) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Tue 09/05 3:21 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 17-10857 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (svc) |
||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 08/09 4:14 PM
USCA Case Number 17-10857 for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. (svc) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 08/03 9:57 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16,17. Thu Aug 3 09:57:45 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
appeal
Transcript Requested/Not Requested
Thu 08/03 9:57 AM
Transcript Order Form: re16 Notice of Appeal transcript not requested. (svc) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 08/03 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Judgment,14 Order Accepting Findings and Recommendations to the Fifth Circuit by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (svc) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Judgment
Fri 07/21 1:53 PM
JUDGMENT (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/21/2017) (ash) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Accepting/Adopting Findings and Recommendations
Fri 07/21 1:47 PM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Findings, Conclusions and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objection. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/21/2017) (ash) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 07/21 1:54 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14,15. Fri Jul 21 13:54:37 CDT 2017 (crt) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File
Wed 06/14 3:21 PM
MOTION for Leave To Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. (ndt) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
8
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Fri 06/02 1:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re11 Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against County of Dallas, Jane Doe 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Darren Marsack by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. (sss) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 06/02 12:58 PM
Combined Request for Clerks Entry of Default and MOTION for Default Judgment against County of Dallas, Jane Doe 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Darren Marsack filed by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. (sss) |
|
misc
Remark
Fri 06/02 1:54 PM
The Clerk declines to enter default re:11 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default because the case is under preliminary judicial screening. See document6 . (sss) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/03 12:48 PM
Request to be Removed from Email Notification filed by Scott Damon Richardson, Sr. [Plaintiff's email removed from account per OATS]. (sss) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
5
pgs
respoth
Objection to Findings and Recommendations
Fri 03/31 5:09 PM
OBJECTION to8 Findings and Recommendations by Darren Marsack. (ykp) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
motion
Findings and Recommendations
Wed 03/22 11:46 AM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) and an order of the District Court, this case has been referred to the United States Magistrate Judge. The Court recommends that: (1) Plaintiff's claim that Officer Marsack verbally abused him should be dismissed with prejudice; and (2) Plaintiff's remaining claims should be dismissed without prejudice under the Younger abstention doctrine. (see order) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 3/22/2017) (mcrd) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
respm
Response/Objection
Thu 02/16 2:44 PM
RESPONSE filed by Scott Damon Richardson re:5 Judge's Questionnaire. |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/08 2:15 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of Court SHALL NOT ISSUE SUMMONS or take any further action pending judicial screening. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 2/8/2017) (ndt) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Judge's Questionnaire
Wed 02/08 2:12 PM
Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire sent to Scott Damon Richardson. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul D Stickney on 2/8/2017) (ndt) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/08 2:12 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Feb 8 14:12:50 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Wed 02/08 2:15 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Feb 8 14:15:28 CST 2017 (crt) |
||
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
5
pgs
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/06 2:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Scott Damon Richardson. (ran) |
|
3 | 3
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/06 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT against Darren Marsack, County of Dallas, Jane Doe 1-5, John Doe 1-5 filed by Scott Damon Richardson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ran) Modified text on 2/6/2017 (ran) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
notice
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party
Mon 02/06 2:26 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ran) |
|
1 | 1
2
pgs
qcref
Cummings (Dallas)
Mon 02/06 2:26 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Stickney (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Stickney). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ran) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Mon 02/06 2:27 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Feb 6 14:27:43 CST 2017 (crt) |