Doe et al v. Donald Trump, President of The United States et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | James L Robart |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00178 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 06, 2017 2:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donald Trump
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rex Tillerson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Customs and Border Protection
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin McAleenan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michele James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jason Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jack Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Council on American Islamic Relations - Washington
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Episcopal Diocese of Olympia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Doe
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Julia Doe
Terminated: 05/08/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Terminated: 05/08/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Two University of Washington students file lawsuit claiming Trump travel ban is unconstitutional (seattletimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |