2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | John K Olson |
Case #: | 0:17-bk-11521 |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC
2519 Aqua Vista Blvd
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-1548 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago |
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 05/15 11:22 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Mon 04/10 4:20 PM
Certificate of Service Corrected by Attorney Andrea S. Hartley . (Hartley, Andrea) |
|
26 | 26
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Mon 04/10 12:41 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Andrea S. Hartley . (Hartley, Andrea) |
|
25 | 25
order
Amended Order
Mon 04/10 7:54 AM
Amended Order Ore Tenus Motion for in Rem Relief as to Real Property Located at 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard , Fot Lauderdale, FL 33301. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 03/20 6:19 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditor Champion Mortgage Company . (Hartley, Andrea) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order (Generic)
Fri 03/17 8:22 AM
Order Granting Ore Tenus Motion for in Rem Relief as to Real Property Located at 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard , Fot Lauderdale, FL 33301. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Affidavit
Thu 03/16 5:32 PM
Affidavit of Cullan Meathe, Managing Member of Debtor of Disbursements for the Period February 8, 2017 to March 7, 2017 Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/10 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order Dismissing Case (Deficiencies)
Tue 03/07 11:13 AM
Order Dismissing Case with 180 Days Prejudice for Failure to File Summary of Schedules, Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Unsworn Declaration, Statement of Financial Affairs, [Filing Fee Balance Due: $0.00] . (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Friday, March 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Employ Order
Fri 03/03 10:15 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Chad Van Horn as Counsel for the Debtor (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Wednesday, March 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service
Wed 03/01 6:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Andrea S. Hartley Filed by Creditor Champion Mortgage Company. (Hartley, Andrea) |
|
Saturday, February 18, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK
Sun 02/19 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Notice Date 02/18/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
attydoc
Certificate of Service [Attorney]
Thu 02/16 12:55 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Chad T Van Horn . (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
15 | 15
court
Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (BK)
Thu 02/16 11:16 AM
Amended Notice of Status Conference scheduled for 02/28/2017 at 10:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
14 | 14
court
Notice of Hearing (BK)
Thu 02/16 11:14 AM
Notice of Hearing Hearing scheduled for 02/28/2017 at 10:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Romero, Christina) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Employ
Thu 02/16 11:06 AM
Application to Employ Chad Van Horn, Esq. and Van Horn Law Group, P.A. as Counsel for Debtor [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Sunday, February 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
Mon 02/13 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Notice Date 02/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
Mon 02/13 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/12/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, February 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Case Management Summary
Sat 02/11 10:41 AM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 02/11 3:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 02/10/2017. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of Creditors 11
Fri 02/10 11:27 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 3/9/2017 at 01:00 PM at 51 SW First Ave Room 1021, Miami. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 5/8/2017. Proofs of Claim due by 6/7/2017. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order Setting Status Hearing/Conference
Fri 02/10 8:34 AM
Order Setting Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 02/28/2017 at 10:00 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Room 301 (JKO), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 02/08 2:59 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 2/22/2017. Schedule A/B due 2/22/2017. Schedule D due 2/22/2017. Schedule E/F due 2/22/2017. Schedule G due 2/22/2017. Schedule H due 2/22/2017.Statement of Financial Affairs Due 2/22/2017.Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 2/22/2017. [Incomplete Filings due by 2/22/2017]. (Banoovong, Bea) |
|
5 | 5
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Wed 02/08 11:10 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Chad T Van Horn. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/08 11:09 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Equity Security Holders
Wed 02/08 11:08 AM
Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Wed 02/08 11:08 AM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor 2519 Aqua Vista Boulevard LLC. (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF]
Wed 02/08 9:21 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Van Horn, Chad) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 02/08 9:58 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11521 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29201936. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |