Konarqui Corp
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | A Jay Cristol |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11528 |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 15, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2018 |
Debtor
Konarqui Corp
285 Ridgewood Rd
Key Biscayne, FL 33149-1226 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert A Angueira
16 SW 1st Avenue
Miami, FL 33130 |
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
Docket last updated: 02/08/2017 12:03 PM EST |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 02/08 11:19 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 17-11528 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29203360. Fee amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]
Wed 02/08 11:11 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $335] (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
2 | 2
court
Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business Asset)
Wed 02/08 11:11 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 03/15/2017 at 10:00 AM at 51 SW First Ave Room 102, Miami. Proofs of Claim due by 06/13/2017. (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
3 | 3
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Wed 02/08 11:11 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Timothy S Kingcade Esq. (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/08 11:12 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Konarqui Corp. (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
attydoc
Disclosure of Compensation
Wed 02/08 11:20 AM
Disclosure of Compensation by Attorney Timothy S Kingcade Esq. (Kingcade, Timothy) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/08 11:21 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Konarqui Corp. (Kingcade, Timothy) |