HARTLAND MMI, LLC
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Mike K Nakagawa |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-10549 |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Dec 26, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 04, 2019 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
HARTLAND MMI, LLC
265 E Warm Springs Rd Ste 104
Las Vegas, NV 89119-4230 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
335 | 335
court
Close Adversary Case
Thu 10/31 12:09 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (dcl) |