Event Solutions Partner LLC
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robyn L Moberly |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-00626 |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 02, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2017 |
Debtor
Event Solutions Partner LLC
3911 E Edgewood Ave
Indianapolis, IN 46237-2443 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Elliott D. Levin
Office of Elliott D. Levin 135 N. Pennsylvania St., #1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 02/09/2017 12:02 AM EST |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 02/08 1:09 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition 17-00626 RLM-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 26861591. Fee amount 335.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
Wed 02/08 1:08 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition (Non-Individual) with Corporate Ownership Statement, Statement of Financial Affairs, Schedule(s) A/B, D, E/F, G and H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Attorney Disclosure of Compensation and Verification of Creditor List filed by Brian Daniel Schellenberg on behalf of Event Solutions Partner LLC. Income & Expense Schedule due by 02/22/2017. (Schellenberg, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Income & Expense Statement
Wed 02/08 2:35 PM
Income & Expense Statement filed by Brian Daniel Schellenberg on behalf of Debtor Event Solutions Partner LLC. (Schellenberg, Brian) |