City of Chelsea et al v. Trump, President of the United States et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | George A Otoole, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10214 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-100
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Donald J. Trump, President of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Chelsea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Lawrence
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 04 2017
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Stay (Halley, Taylor) |
1. | Cities of Lawrence and Chelsea file lawsuit challenging Trump's order stripping funding for sanctuary cities (bostonglobe.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/09/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 01/26 2:20 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Lyness, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/30 11:20 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America. (Roberts, Charles) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/30 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles E.T. Roberts on behalf of Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Kirstjen M NIELSEN, Jeff Sessions, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America (Roberts, Charles) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
Tue 11/30 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by David Jacob Zimmer for Brian T. Burgess (Zimmer, David) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
Tue 11/30 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by David Jacob Zimmer (Zimmer, David) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
Tue 06/19 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by W. Scott Simpson (Change of Address) (Simpson, W.) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Thu 06/07 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Michelle Sohn (Sohn, Michelle) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 12/29 4:36 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying21 In light of the stay entered in this case at the unopposed request of the plaintiffs (dkt. nos. 25 & 26), this action shall be administratively closed. The parties should notify the Court in the event they wish to restore the case to the Court's active docket. The pending motion to dismiss ( dkt. no. 21) is denied without prejudice to renewal if the case is reopened. (adminn, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 10/03 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Simpson on behalf of Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America, Jeff Sessions, Elaine C. Duke (Simpson, W.) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/15 3:18 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Fri 06/30 11:12 AM
STATUS REPORT submitted jointly by all parties by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 05/04 11:48 AM
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ORDER entered granting25 Motion to Stay (Halley, Taylor) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Stay
Tue 05/02 5:51 PM
MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Unopposed) by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/20 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Sady on behalf of Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, Does 1-100, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America (Sady, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 04/19 11:42 AM
Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting22 Motion for Extension of Time to File to May 8, 2017 to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to file excess pages (Halley, Taylor) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 04/18 3:23 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 8, 2017 to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to file excess pages by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/10 5:06 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America.(Buckingham, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Buckingham on behalf of Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States, John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, President of the United States, United States of America (Buckingham, Stephen) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald J. Trump, President of the United States served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 03/31 1:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States served on 2/13/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Fri 03/31 1:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to US Attorney by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. Dana J. Boente, Acting Attorney General of the United States served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; John F. Kelly, Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; Donald J. Trump, President of the United States served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017; United States of America served on 2/8/2017, answer due 4/10/2017. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Fri 02/10 3:20 PM
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Halley, Taylor) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
misc
Exhibit
Wed 02/08 2:24 PM
EXHIBIT re2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487863 Exhibit D - Executed Declaration of Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence. (Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Wed 02/08 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Wed 02/08 10:35 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia L. Hall on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Hall, Sophia) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Oren M. Sellstrom on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Sellstrom, Oren) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Sohn on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Sohn, Michelle) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Louis L. Lobel on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Lobel, Louis) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:05 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Lu on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Lu, Alexandra) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Fischer on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Fischer, Sarah) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 10:00 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer B. Luz on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Luz, Jennifer) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Herrmann Blais on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Blais, Elaine) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 02/08 9:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daryl L. Wiesen on behalf of City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence (Wiesen, Daryl) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/08 9:46 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Elizabeth J. Holland, Brian T. Burgess, David J. Zimmer, and Ivan Espinoza-Madrigal Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487863 by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
1 | 1
45
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/08 9:32 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6487845 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by City of Chelsea, City of Lawrence.(Friedman-Boyce, Inez) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Category Sheet |