Galat v. APCER Life Sciences, Inc. et al
New Hampshire District Court | |
Judge: | Paul J Barbadoro |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00047 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 5:46 AM EDT |
Defendant
APCER Life Sciences, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suneet Walia
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guarav Saxena
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bernard Galat
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 01/08 3:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Filed as to All Claims and Defenses with Prejudice by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 01/08 4:57 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (vln) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
notice
Case Settlement
Fri 12/08 12:01 PM
Benjamin B. Folsom advised case settled. Agreement for entry of judgment or a stipulation of dismissal to be filed within 30 days or the court will dismiss the case with prejudice. Case Settlement Deadline 1/8/2018. (vln) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Objection to Motion
Tue 11/28 4:04 PM
OBJECTION to22 MOTION to Extend Time to in Which Substitute Counsel for Plaintiff May File Appearance (Partially Assented to) filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia. (Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extend Time
Wed 11/15 2:51 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to in Which Substitute Counsel for Plaintiff May File Appearance, filed by Bernard Galat. Follow up on Objection on 11/27/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(vln) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/23 11:09 AM
Assented to MOTION for Michael Varraso & Benjamin Wyatt to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Bernard Galat.(Varraso, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 10/23 1:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Text of Order: Granted. Within 21 days, substitute counsel shall enter an appearance or, in the alternative, the plaintiff shall notify the court of his decision to appear pro se (without counsel). See Local Rule 83.6(b) and (d). Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of the case. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
12
pgs
order
Protective Order
Mon 08/28 4:40 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Protective Order
Mon 08/28 9:38 AM
Assented to MOTION for Protective Order filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Protective Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 08/28 4:39 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Assented to Motion for Protective Order. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 06/21 4:06 PM
///ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss Count XII of Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other
Mon 05/08 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Mediation JOINT - June 26, 2017 by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice-Mediation Statement
Thu 05/04 2:49 PM
Clerk's Notice - No Mediation Statement Filed. According to the parties' discovery plan, a mediation statement was due to be filed by 5/1/2017. The parties are directed to file their mediation statement within 14 days of this notice. Mediation Follow Up on 5/18/2017. (vln) |
||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Reply to Objection to Motion
Mon 04/17 5:06 PM
REPLY to Objection to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss Count XII of Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit (Affidavit) Supplemental J. Haftel Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit A to Supplemental J. Haftel Affidavit | ||
order
Endorsed Order - not on motion
Tue 04/18 8:12 AM
ENDORSED ORDER 15 Notice of Joint Statement re ESI. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln) |
||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 04/14 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Joint Statement re ESI by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Intent to Reply
Thu 04/06 11:41 AM
Notice of Intent to Reply to Objection to8 MOTION to Dismiss Count XII of Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) . Follow up on Reply on 4/20/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Objection to Motion
Mon 04/03 6:41 PM
OBJECTION to8 MOTION to Dismiss Count XII of Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Bernard Galat.(Varraso, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law Memo In Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Galat Affidavit | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Discovery Plan
Thu 03/23 11:32 AM
ORDER approving in part 10 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-4 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/9/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 6/23/2017. Discovery deadline 3/30/2018. Discovery Status Conference set for 1/29/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. At least 7 days prior to the date of the conference, the parties shall submit a joint statement regarding the status of discovery. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 1/22/2018. Mediation Follow Up on 5/1/2017.(vln) |
|
notice
Trial Notice
Thu 03/23 11:38 AM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 7/10/2018 09:30 AM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Pretrial Statements due 6/8/2018. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 6/22/2018. JERS Statement due 6/22/2018. (vln) |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 03/22 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Varraso on behalf of Bernard Galat Attorney Michael Varraso added to party Bernard Galat(pty:pla).(Varraso, Michael) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Discovery Plan
Mon 03/20 9:09 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan (Jointly Filed) filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia. (Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/20 9:07 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss
Mon 03/20 9:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Count XII of Complaint for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena. Follow up on Objection on 4/3/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in support of 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Jennifer Haftel, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment to Exhibit Haftel Exhibit A (Offer Letter), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Gaurav Saxena | ||
Tuesday, February 28, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Tue 02/28 10:51 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 7 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 3/20/2017.(vln) |
||
Monday, February 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Mon 02/27 4:52 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to March 20, 2017 filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer
Fri 02/17 9:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/27/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(vln) |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extend Time to Answer
Wed 02/15 3:42 PM
Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 27, 2017 or to Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by APCER Life Sciences, Inc., Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
State Court Record
Tue 02/14 1:26 PM
Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 218-2017-CV-00022, Rockingham County Superior Court(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
notice
Pretrial Conference
Tue 02/14 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan due by 3/20/2017. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln) |
||
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/10 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charla B. Stevens on behalf of Guarav Saxena, Suneet Walia Attorney Charla B. Stevens added to party Guarav Saxena(pty:dft), Attorney Charla B. Stevens added to party Suneet Walia(pty:dft).(Stevens, Charla) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Attorney Appearance
Fri 02/10 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charla B. Stevens on behalf of APCER Life Sciences, Inc. Attorney Charla B. Stevens added to party APCER Life Sciences, Inc.(pty:dft).(Stevens, Charla) |
|
notice
Notice - Other
Fri 02/10 11:31 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(b), a motion filed in the state court will not be considered unless it is refiled in this court. Please note that all motions filed in this District must comply with Local Rule 7, which outlines the court' s motion practice regarding briefs and objections. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website at www.nhd.uscourts.gov.(vln) |
||
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice - ECF
Thu 02/09 10:42 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (mc) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 02/08 3:41 PM
Disclosure Statement by APCER Life Sciences, Inc. disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal - New Case
Wed 02/08 3:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from New Hampshire Superior Court, Rockingham County, case number 218-2017-cv-00022 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1476375) filed by Gaurav Saxena, Suneet Walia, APCER Life Sciences, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 3/1/2017. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/22/2017.(Folsom, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (State Court), | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Thu 02/09 10:41 AM
Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:17-cv-47-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) |