Alvarez v. Department of Education of the City of New York et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00935 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441nr Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Superintendent Carron Staple
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shadia Alvarez
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Department of Education of the City of New York
Terminated: 06/20/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, October 29, 2018 | ||
76 | 76
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 10/29 12:18 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:75 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Carron Staple against Shadia Alvarez. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion & Order dated October 26, 2018, the Court holds that, viewing the evidence in the light most favorable to Alvarez, the complaints about school safety that she claims were the impetus for retaliation by Staple were the speech of an employee pursuant to her official duties, not the protected speech of a citizen. Accordingly Staple's summary judgment motion is granted and Alvarez's claim of retaliation under the First Amendment is dismissed; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/29/2018)(km) |
|
Att: 1 Right to Appeal | ||
utility
Terminate Transcript Deadlines
Mon 10/29 12:20 PM
Terminate Transcript Deadlines (km) |
||
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
75 | 75
22
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 10/26 9:43 AM
OPINION & ORDER re:57 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carron Staple. For the reasons above, the Court holds that, viewing the evidence in the light most favorable to Alvarez, the complaints about school safety that she claims were the impetus for retaliation by Staple were the speech of an employee pursuant to her official duties, not the protected speech of a citizen. The Court accordingly grants Staple's summary judgment motion and dismisses Alvarez's claim of retaliation under the First Amendment. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 57 and to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/26/2018) (anc) |