Crowder v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Kansas District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Crow |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02083 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 07, 2017 4:47 AM CDT |
Defendant
Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Social Security Regional Administrator
Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel 601 E. 12th Street, Room 535
Kansas City, MO 64106 |
|
Plaintiff
Henry F. Crowder, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 13 2018
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The judgment of the Commissioner is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/13/18. (msb) |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment
Fri 04/13 3:26 PM
JUDGMENT ENTERED: The judgment of the Commissioner is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/13/18. (msb) |
|
19 | 19
20
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Fri 04/13 3:23 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The judgment of the Commissioner is affirmed pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/13/18. (msb) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Social Security - Plaintiffs Reply Brief
Mon 10/02 4:36 PM
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF by Henry F. Crowder, Jr (Cox, Leland) |
|
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 10/02 4:34 PM
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Henry F. Crowder, Jr re:13 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Plaintiff's Brief Plaintiff's Reply Brief (Cox, Leland) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Social Security - Commissioners Response Brief
Mon 09/18 1:58 PM
COMMISSIONER'S RESPONSE BRIEF by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (Taylor, Andrea) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief
Fri 08/18 3:54 PM
PLAINTIFF'S SOCIAL SECURITY BRIEF PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO REVERSE DECISION OF THE DEFENDANT by Henry F. Crowder, Jr(Cox, Leland) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 07/25 1:58 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by 8/22/2017. Entered by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/25/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 07/20 2:07 PM
Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file Plaintiff's Brief by Plaintiff Henry F. Crowder, Jr. (Cox, Leland) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 06/08 1:42 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of.(Taylor, Andrea) |
|
Att: 1 Transcript of the Administrative Record | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA
Tue 04/25 1:22 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Henry F. Crowder, Jr. upon Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 4/12/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (ydm) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Return of Service of Summons as to USAG/ORC
Tue 04/18 10:48 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons issued to US Attorney General served on 04/14/2017 by certified mail (USM-285) filed by Plaintiff Henry F. Crowder, Jr. (cv) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA
Tue 04/11 4:21 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service (USM-285) by Henry F. Crowder, Jr. upon Social Security Administration, Commissioner of (U.S. Attorney) served on 4/10/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. (cv) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 04/07 11:24 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Entered by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 4/7/17. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 04/07 12:21 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service)(USM-285) (cv) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Financial Affidavit
Thu 04/06 10:23 AM
(NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Henry F. Crowder, Jr.. (Cox, Leland) |
|
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Minute Order
Fri 02/17 3:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to supplement Motion to proceed without prepayment of fees4 . Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/17/17. (Attachment: #1 Financial Affidavit)(msb) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 02/09 10:37 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: On January 20, 2017, Nancy A. Berryhill replaced Carolyn W. Colvin as the Acting Commissioner of Social Security. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of has been updated to reflect this change.(cv) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
support
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Thu 02/09 8:50 AM
AFFIDAVIT re4 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis NOTE Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Henry Crowder, Jr.(cv) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/08 2:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis NOTE Access to document is restricted pursuant to the Courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Henry Crowder (Cox, Leland) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/08 2:17 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Henry Crowder (Cox, Leland) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 02/08 2:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Henry Crowder. (Cox, Leland) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (attorney)
Wed 02/08 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City, filed by Henry Crowder.(Cox, Leland) |
|
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Thu 02/09 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cv) |