Dimas Retail Group, Inc.
California Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher B Latham |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-00698 |
Case Filed: | Feb 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 09, 2017 |
Debtor
Dimas Retail Group, Inc.
8895 Towne Centre Dr Ste 3-105
San Diego, CA 92122-5542 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 402 West Broadway, Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101 |
Docket last updated: 02/09/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (fee) external
Wed 02/08 5:22 PM
Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 335.00. Declaration re: ECF due by 02/22/2017, Filed by Douglas Jaffe of Law Offices of Douglas Jaffe on behalf of Dimas Retail Group, Inc.. (Jaffe, Douglas) |
|
2 | 2
crditcrd
Auto-docket of credit card
Wed 02/08 5:23 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition([LINK 17-00698 7] ) [misc,1027] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Fee Amount 335.00 Receipt number A12959346 ; (U.S. Treasury) |
|
3 | 3
ans
Declaration
Wed 02/08 5:44 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Douglas Jaffe of Law Offices of Douglas Jaffe on behalf of Dimas Retail Group, Inc.. (Jaffe, Douglas) |