INFRARED, INC
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Bruce T Beesley |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-50113 |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Debtor
INFRARED, INC
14420 Chamy Dr
Reno, NV 89521-7310 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
JERI COPPA-KNUDSON
3495 LAKESIDE DR PMB #62
RENO, NV 89509 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - RN - 7
300 BOOTH STREET, STE 3009
RENO, NV 89509 |
Docket last updated: 02/10/2017 12:02 AM PST |
Thursday, February 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition 7
Thu 02/09 3:01 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $335. Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of INFRARED, INC (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing
Thu 02/09 3:02 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by STEPHEN R HARRIS on behalf of INFRARED, INC (HARRIS, STEPHEN) |
|
3 | 3
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Non-Individual (BNC-auto assignment)
Thu 02/09 3:02 PM
|
|
4 | 4
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Thu 02/09 3:03 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition 7 17-50113 [misc,volp7pb] ( 335.00). Receipt number 17309106, fee amount $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |