California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:17-cv-01062
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2017
Last checked: Friday Feb 10, 2017 12:20 AM PST
Defendant
Marco Beltrami
Defendant
NS Pictures, Inc.
Defendant
Pianella Music Inc.
Defendant
Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.,
Plaintiff
Aron M. Marderosian
Represented By
Brian G Wolf
Lavely And Singer
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert J. Marderosian
Represented By
Brian G Wolf
Lavely And Singer
contact info
Plaintiff
TWELVE SIXTY LLC
Represented By
Brian G Wolf
Lavely And Singer
contact info

Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
15 15 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 4:54 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., answer now due 4/3/2017; NS Pictures, Inc. answer now due 4/3/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.,; NS Pictures, Inc..(Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party NS Pictures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M Burrow added to party Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc.,(pty:dft))(Burrow, Linda)
Related: [-]
14 14 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 4:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marco Beltrami answer now due 4/14/2017; Pianella Music Inc. answer now due 4/14/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendants Marco Beltrami; Pianella Music Inc..(Attorney Jeremiah Tracy Reynolds added to party Marco Beltrami(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremiah Tracy Reynolds added to party Pianella Music Inc.(pty:dft)) Related [+]
Related: [-] ynolds, Jeremiah
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
12 12 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 10:48 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Twelve Sixty LLC, Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, upon Defendant Pianella Music Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2017, answer due 4/3/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by David S. Blau, Esq., Authorized Legal Counsel. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 10:44 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Twelve Sixty LLC, Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, upon Defendant Marco Beltrami acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/13/2017, answer due 4/3/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by David S. Blau, Esq., Authorized Legal Counsel. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
10 10 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 3:45 PM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Twelve Sixty LLC, Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, upon Defendant NS Pictures, Inc. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Wayne M. Smith, Authorized Signatory/Attorney for Defendant. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed Tue 3:39 PM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Twelve Sixty LLC, Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, upon Defendant Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 2/28/2017, answer due 3/21/2017. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Wayne M. Smith, Senior Vice President, Corporate Legal. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 9:30 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Marco Beltrami, NS Pictures, Inc., Pianella Music Inc., and Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 9:08 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2017
5 5 notice Summons Request Thu 3:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, TWELVE SIXTY LLC. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 3:39 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, TWELVE SIXTY LLC. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 3:35 PM
PLAINTIFFS CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT [F.R.C.P. 7.1] AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES [L.R. 7.1-1] NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 3:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Aron M. Marderosian, Robert J. Marderosian, TWELVE SIXTY LLC. (Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 3:21 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19339889 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Robert J. Marderosian, TWELVE SIXTY LLC, Aron M. Marderosian. (Attorney Brian G Wolf added to party Aron M. Marderosian(pty:pla), Attorney Brian G Wolf added to party Robert J. Marderosian(pty:pla), Attorney Brian G Wolf added to party TWELVE SIXTY LLC(pty:pla))(Wolf, Brian)
Related: [-]