Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas J Catliota
Case #: 1:17-bk-11789
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2017

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Wheaton LLC
9927 Stephen Decatur Hwy F20
Ocean City, MD 21842
Represented By
Ronald J Drescher
Drescher & Associates
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee - Baltimore
Garmatz Federal Courthouse 101 West Lombard Street Suite 2625
Baltimore, MD 21201


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Friday, March 17, 2017
22 22 answer Opposition Fri 6:55 PM
Opposition on behalf of Wheaton LLC Filed by Ronald J Drescher Related [+]. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-] 14 Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion filed by Creditor Ernest Gerardi, Creditor Marilyn G. Gerardi
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Sunday, March 12, 2017
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 1:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 03/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Order Setting Hearing (bk)
Saturday, March 11, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/11/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Application to Employ
Friday, March 10, 2017
19 19 order Setting Hearing (bk) Fri 3:09 PM
Order And Notice Of A Hearing On Motion To Dismiss Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at 341 meeting room 104 at 129 East Main St., Salisbury. (Oliver, Yvette)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Ernest Gerardi, Creditor Marilyn G. Gerardi
Thursday, March 09, 2017
18 18 misc Memorandum Thu 2:03 PM
Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Filed by John B. Robins IV Related [+]. (Robins, John)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor Ernest Gerardi, Creditor Marilyn G. Gerardi
Att: 1 Exhibit Judgment Liens
17 17 motion Dismiss Case Thu 2:01 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case for other reasons Filed by Ernest Gerardi, Marilyn G. Gerardi. (Robins, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Judgment Liens
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Att: 3 Proposed Order
16 16 order Employ Thu 11:21 AM
Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney Ronald J. Drescher & Drescher & Associates, PA - SO ORDERED - No response or objection. In the event that a conflict arises between the debtor and the business partner, the matter will have to be addressed. Related [+]. (Burkhart, Mary)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Employ Ronald J. Drescher & Drescher & Associates PA as attorney for debtor filed by Debtor Wheaton LLC
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
trustee Chapter 11 341 Meeting Report Wed 4:23 PM
U.S. Trustee's 341 Meeting Report: The U.S. Trustee hereby reports that the Meeting of Creditors for this case was conducted and concluded by the U.S. Trustee pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 341(a)on March 8, 2017. Filed by US Trustee - Baltimore. (Bernstein, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
15 15 crditcrd none Fri 2:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion 17-11789 [motion,mrlfntc] ( 181.00). Receipt number 30212105. Fee amount 181.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 14
14 14 motion Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion Fri 2:01 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay and Notice of Motion Re: 6038 South Point Road, Berlin, MD 21811. Fee Amount $181. Notice Served on 3/3/2017, Filed by Ernest Gerardi, Marilyn G. Gerardi. Objections due by 03/17/2017. with three additional Court days allowed if all parties are not served electronically. Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 at 10:00 AM - Room 104, Salisbury. (Robins, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Judgment
Att: 2 Exhibit Mortgage
Att: 3 Notice of Motion
Monday, February 27, 2017
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on behalf of Marilyn G. Gerardi, Ernest Gerardi Filed by John B. Robins IV. (Robins, John)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Affidavit Mon 2:33 PM
Affidavit Re: Paul Palitti Application to Employ Ronald J. Drescher & Drescher & Associates PA as attorney for debtor Filed by Ronald J Drescher Related [+]. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-] 5 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Wheaton LLC
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
11 11 misc Chapter 11 Small Business Documents Wed 12:59 PM
Chapter 11 Small Business Documents Filed by Ronald J Drescher. Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2017.Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 08/21/2017. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 7:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by US Trustee - Baltimore. (Goldberg, Edmund)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 12, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Mon 12:43 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 02/12/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Friday, February 10, 2017
7 7 court Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents Fri 10:49 AM
Notice of Deadline for Filing Missing Documents and Warning of Possible Dismissal. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 122B due 2/24/2017.Balance Sheet Due 2/24/2017.Statement of Operations due 2/24/2017.Cash Flow Statement due 2/24/2017.Federal Income Tax Return date: 2/24/2017. Incomplete Filings due 2/24/2017 (Burkhart, Mary)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Employ Fri 7:15 AM
Application to Employ Ronald J. Drescher & Drescher & Associates PA as attorney for debtor and Verified Statement of Proposed Party Filed by Wheaton LLC. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 misc Support Document Fri 7:11 AM
Support Document Corporate Resolution Filed by Ronald J Drescher Related [+]. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Wheaton LLC
3 3 crditcrd none Fri 7:09 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-11789 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 30087547. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
2 2 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Fri 7:08 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Ronald J Drescher. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc VOLUNTARY Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 7:08 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Wheaton LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Exclusivity expires 06/12/2017. Government Proof of Claim due by 08/9/2017. (Drescher, Ronald)
Related: [-]
court Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 10:30 AM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a)
Related: [-]