Tango Development Inc
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Catherine Peek Mcewen |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-01049 |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Apr 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Debtor
Tango Development Inc
2328 124th Dr E
Parrish, FL 34219-6947 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA7/13
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Docket last updated: 02/10/2017 12:03 PM EST |
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/10 3:11 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(8:17-bk-01049) [misc,volp7a2] ( 335.00). Receipt Number 52655762, Amount Paid $ 335.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
Fri 02/10 3:00 AM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7. (Verify Fee). Schedules and Statements Not Filed Statement of Financial Affairs Not Filed . Disclosure of Compensation Not Filed or Not Required . Filed by Richard V Lee on behalf of Tango Development Inc. (Lee, Richard) |