LoganTree v. Garmin International, Inc. et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Fred Biery |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00098 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 09, 2017 4:48 AM CDT |
Defendant
Garmin International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Garmin USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Garmin, LTD.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LoganTree
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Fri 06/23 1:35 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office (Closing Case). (wg) |
|
27 | 27
order
Judgment
Fri 06/23 9:56 AM
JUDGMENT, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Garmins Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(3) is GRANTED in PART such that defendants Rule 12(b)(3) motion is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling in a proper venue. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
26 | 26
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 06/23 9:54 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD., is GRANTED in PART such that defendants Rule 12(b)(3) motion is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refiling in a proper venue. Defendants Rule 12(b)(6) motion is DISMISSED AS MOOT because this Court leaves resolution of that issue to another court should plaintiff elect to refile this case in a proper venue.Any pending Motions are Dismissed as Moot, this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Statement of Issues
Mon 06/05 3:08 PM
STATEMENT OF ISSUES (CORRECTED) by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
24 | 24
notice
Deficiency Notice
Mon 06/05 8:06 AM
***NOTIFIED COUNSEL, DOCUMENT HAS NO COVER PAGE, ATTY. SIGNATURE OR CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE *** DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 23 Attachment, (wg) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Attachment
Fri 06/02 5:27 PM
ATTACHMENT Exhibits A-C to22 Statement of Issues by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit C | ||
22 | 22
misc
Statement of Issues
Fri 06/02 5:11 PM
STATEMENT OF ISSUES by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Wingard, Steven) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 05/05 4:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Garmin USA, Inc., Defendant Garmin, LTD. (Wingard, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/28 6:24 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by LoganTree, re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Garmin USA, Inc., Defendant Garmin, LTD. (Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
19 | 19
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 04/28 2:57 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD., re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Garmin USA, Inc., Defendant Garmin, LTD. , re17 Response in opposition to motion (Amstutz, Paige) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Thu 04/27 3:31 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (Wingard, Steven) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 8:45 AM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by LoganTree, re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Garmin USA, Inc., Defendant Garmin, LTD.(Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/19 9:23 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/19 9:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order.; GRANTING14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/18 5:40 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard for Adam P. Seitz ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9504831) by on behalf of Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/18 5:36 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard for Michelle L. Marriott ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9504809) by on behalf of Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/18 5:31 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven J. Wingard for Clifford T. Brazil ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-9504764) by on behalf of Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/14 6:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Mon 03/20 4:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING re7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants Garmin International, Inc. and Garmin USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., answer due 4/14/2017; Garmin USA, Inc. answer due 4/14/2017; Garmin, LTD. answer due 4/14/2017.. Signed by Judge Fred Biery. (wg) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/16 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Wingard on behalf of Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. (Wingard, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 03/16 9:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc. (Amstutz, Paige) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 03/15 4:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants Garmin International, Inc. and Garmin USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc..(Wingard, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 12:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc.. (wg) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120)
Mon 02/13 8:47 AM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (wg) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement (Rule 7)
Fri 02/10 4:21 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by LoganTree. (Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/10 1:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by LoganTree. (Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing
Fri 02/10 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Filing Complaint regarding a Patent or Trademark by LoganTree (Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
1 | 1
13
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/10 11:46 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9283607), filed by LoganTree.(Shokouhi, Arnold) |
|
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 8 pgs Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 02/14 9:21 AM
Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Fred Biery. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg) |
||
misc
To be Referred to SA Mag Judge
Tue 02/14 9:22 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg) |