Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Lurana S Snow
Case #: 0:17-cv-60327
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:0451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2017
Last checked: Monday Feb 13, 2017 6:11 PM EST
Defendant
Magic Leap, Inc.
Plaintiff
Tannen Campbell
Represented By
William Robert Amlong
Amlong & Amlong
contact info
Karen Coolman Amlong
Amlong & Amlong, PA
contact info

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
12 12 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 5:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isha Kochhar on behalf of Tannen Campbell. Attorney Isha Kochhar added to party Tannen Campbell(pty:pla). (Kochhar, Isha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 6:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magic Leap, Inc. (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 6:51 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Magic Leap, Inc.. (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 1:01 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Magic Leap, Inc.. Answer due 3/16/2017. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Tannen Campbell. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/3/2017. (lan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Wed 5:28 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint, by Magic Leap, Inc.. Attorney Jose Ignacio Leon added to party Magic Leap, Inc.(pty:dft). (Leon, Jose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 3:50 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tannen Campbell. Magic Leap, Inc. served on 2/13/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (Amlong, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 3:16 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tannen Campbell. Magic Leap, Inc. served on 2/14/2017, answer due 3/7/2017. (Amlong, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2017
5 5 order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 10:43 AM
ORDER REQUIRING COUNSEL TO MEET, FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND JOINT DISCOVERY REPORT Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 2/14/2017. (lan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2017
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 1:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Magic Leap, Inc. (fbn) Modified on 2/13/2017 (fbn)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge - FORM Mon 1:45 PM
Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (fbn)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 1:45 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (fbn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Magic Leap, Inc., a Delaware corporation,. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-9480540, filed by Tannen Campbell.(Amlong, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Summons to Magic Leap, Inc.