Morris v. Social Security Administration
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia S Harris |
Referred: | Patricia S Harris |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00020 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2018 |
Defendant
Social Security Administration
|
|
Interested Party
Social Security Administration - Office of General Counsel
|
|
Plaintiff
Mica Morris
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
misc
Case File Note
Mon 07/18 3:21 PM
CASE FILE NOTE:11 Administrative Transcript maintained as a material record and sent to the National Records Center (Accession 021 22-0130 Box 3). The remainder of the file is maintained as an electronic record. (ade) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Judgment
Wed 01/17 3:39 PM
JUDGMENT it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be and it hereby is dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/17/2018. (jak) |
|
15 | 15
8
pgs
order
Order
Wed 01/17 3:35 PM
ORDER finding that hat the final decision of Berryhill is affirmed and Morris' complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 1/17/2018. (jak) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Defendant's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 10/27 3:29 PM
DEFENDANT'S BRIEF filed by Social Security Administration. (Newman, Melinda) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Plaintiff's Brief (Social Security)
Fri 09/15 12:07 AM
PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF filed by Mica Morris. Defendant Brief due by 10/27/2017 (Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/03 1:11 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Brief due by 9/14/2017. Defendant Brief due within 42 days of the day Plaintiff's Brief is served. Signed at the direction of the Court on 8/3/2017. (cfd) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Administrative Transcript
Thu 08/03 10:54 AM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re9 Answer to Complaint and10 Notice of Filing. Document received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (alm) (Documents w/restricted access added as attachments on 08/03/2017 for review by Court users only.) (alm) |
|
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Thu 08/03 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re8 MOTION for Leave to File. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the docket entry was filed in error (wrong case). (jak) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 08/02 4:54 PM
NOTICE by Social Security Administration re9 Answer to Complaint Conventional Filing of Administrative Transcript (Newman, Melinda) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/02 4:52 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Social Security Administration.(Newman, Melinda) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 08/02 4:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File by Social Security Administration (Newman, Melinda) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melinda R. Newman on behalf of Social Security Administration (Newman, Melinda) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Wed 04/05 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mica Morris. Social Security Administration served on 2/24/2017.(Wallace, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Notice of Docket Correction
Fri 02/17 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re4 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (incorrect file date). The correct document was added to docket entry4 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge
Thu 02/16 4:53 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/2017. (jak) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 02/14 3:56 PM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The applicant may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or the necessity of giving security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris on 2/14/2017. (jak) |
|
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 02/14 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Mica Morris.(jak) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 02/13 3:15 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mica Morris. (jak) |