Bausley v. Bulution et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | D P Marshall Jr |
Referred: | J Thomas Ray |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00089 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2017 |
Defendant
E W Bulution
|
|
Defendant
Wendy Kelly
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Lavelle Bausley
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Tue 03/14 2:51 PM
E-MAIL received from the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas confirming the case was received and opened in their Court as case number 6:17-cv-06027. (jak) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order
Tue 03/14 1:37 PM
ORDER transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas, Hot Springs Division. The transfer is immediate because the receiving Court is in the Eighth Circuit too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/14/2017. (jak) |
|
misc
Docket Note
Tue 03/14 1:38 PM
Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas on this date. (jak) |
||
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 2:52 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Charles Lavelle Bausley. (ljb) |