Linn v. Andrews et al
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | James M Moody Jr |
Referred: | Patricia S Harris |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00038 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jan 04, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2019 |
Defendant
Jeremy Andrews
|
|
Defendant
Keith Waddle
|
|
Defendant
Michael Bolden
|
|
Defendant
Randy Watson
|
|
Defendant
Ray Hobbs
|
|
Defendant
Raymond Naylor
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Linn
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, March 03, 2020 | ||
141 | 141
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 03/04 10:23 AM
MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 02/11/2020 as to135 Notice of Appeal filed by Kevin Linn. (ajt) |