CAT Scale Company v Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc.
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Lou Robinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:15 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc.
PO Box 1203
Weatherford, TX 76086 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAT Scale Company
515 Sterling Drive
Walcott, IA 52773 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Fri 05/05 3:01 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Final Order. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (awc) |
|
13 | 13
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 05/05 1:05 PM
AGREED CONSENT JUDGMENT. (See order for specifics.) The clerk will prepare the final Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. Motions terminated:12 Joint MOTION for Judgment filed by CAT Scale Company. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/5/2017) (awc) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Judgment
Thu 05/04 9:01 AM
Joint MOTION for Judgment filed by CAT Scale Company (Stewart, Christian) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 03/27 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A Isern on behalf of Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Isern, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/15 3:30 PM
ORIGINAL RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall be ready for trial by 11/20/2017. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 6/26/2017. Discovery due by 9/18/2017. Pretrial Materials (designation of expert witnesses) due by 5/22/2017 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 6/12/2017 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Joinder of Parties due by 5/1/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/11/2017. Motions for summary judgment due by 9/18/2017. All other motions except motions in limine due by 10/16/2017. Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due by 11/6/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/15/2017) (djs) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Mon 03/13 1:45 PM
ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ahmad G. Azam. If not already done, Applicant must register as an ECF User within 14 days (LR 5.1(f)). It is FURTHER ORDERED that because counsel for the Defendant does not reside or maintain his principal office in this division, or in this district, and because Local Rule 83.10 states: Requirement of Local Counsel - (a) Local Counsel Required, (b) Duties of Local Counsel, then counsel for the Defendant is to comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) and (b) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/13/2017) (awc) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/10 4:34 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint filed by Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Azam, Ahmad) Modified to delete jury demand from docket text on 3/10/2017 (awc) |
|
Att: 1 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS | ||
7 | 7
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Fri 03/10 3:46 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $25; Receipt number 0539-8269218) filed by Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc. Attorney Ahmad Gassan Azam added to party Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc.(pty:dft) (Azam, Ahmad) |
|
Thursday, February 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned
Thu 02/23 9:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc. ; served on 2/15/2017. (Stewart, Christian) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
Mon 02/13 3:23 PM
Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (awc) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/13 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc. (awc) |
|
3 | 3
qcref
Robinson
Mon 02/13 3:11 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Robinson. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (awc) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 1:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CAT Scale Company. (Stewart, Christian) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Hana Travel Plaza Amarillo, Inc. filed by CAT Scale Company. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8204923) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Stewart, Christian) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 11 Cover Sheet |