Baxter v. BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Lou Robinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00029 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 5:33 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ardent Health Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
ADR Provider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendy Baxter
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 09/29 4:40 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Pursuant to the parties' Rule 41(a) joint stipulation, filed September 29, 2017, and their joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 9/29/2017) (vls) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/29 10:01 AM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Ardent Health Services, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC. (Brod, Jamie) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Mon 09/18 4:48 PM
ORDER: On September 15, 2017, the parties filed a Joint Notice of Settlement informing the Court that they have settled all disputes in the above-captioned case. Accordingly, all pending motions are moot and will not be ruled upon by the Court. The Clerk will terminate all pending motions. Any party wishing to reurge any motion must promptly so inform the Court. The parties are ordered to file an agreed stipulation of dismissal on or before September 29, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 9/18/2017) (daa) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/15 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Joint Settlement filed by Wendy Baxter, Ardent Health Services, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC (Urich, Sean) Added filer on 9/15/2017 (daa) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/14 5:00 PM
ORDER: On July 7, 2017 the Court ordered the parties to non-binding mediation. The parties were also ordered to inform the Court of the outcome of mediation. The parties filed a Joint Settlement Status Report on July 28, 2017 intending to mediate on September 5, 2017. As of this date the parties have not notified the Court as to the completion of mediation. The parties are ORDERED to immediately file a report informing the Court of the status of this case, due on or before September 18, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 9/14/2017) (daa) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Fri 07/28 8:46 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Settlement Status Report filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services. (Brod, Jamie) Added filers on 7/28/2017 (daa) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/25 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Joint Designation of Mediator filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo LLC, Ardent Health Services (Brod, Jamie) Added filers on 7/25/2017 (daa) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time
Fri 07/21 6:25 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint MOTION for Two-Week Extension of Mediation Deadline filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that the parties' deadline to mediate is extended to September 8, 2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 7/21/2017) (daa) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 07/21 12:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Two-Week Extension of Mediation Deadline filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services (Brod, Jamie) Added filers on 7/21/2017 (daa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order For ADR
Mon 07/10 2:06 PM
ORDER: The parties are to select or designate a mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for parties to designate a mediator is on or before 7/28/2017. The parties shall meet prior to mediation for the purpose of settling this case. After this meeting, the parties are to tender for filing a joint settlement conference status report on or before Friday, July 28, 2017. Deadline for mediation is on or before 8/25/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 7/10/2017) (daa) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Mon 07/10 8:50 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Setting Forth Status of Settlement Negotiations filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services. (Brod, Jamie) Added filers on 7/10/2017 (daa) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
trial
Designation of Experts
Fri 06/23 8:55 AM
Designation of Experts by BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services. (Urich, Sean) Added filer on 6/23/2017 (daa) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 05/18 2:15 PM
STIPULATION AND AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER re:10 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/18/2017) (daa) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Protective Order
Fri 05/12 11:09 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Wendy Baxter, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC, Ardent Health Services (Brod, Jamie) Added filers on 5/12/2017 (daa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Tue 05/02 4:06 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the parties' Rule 26(/) Conference, filed on May 1, 2017. Paragraph 7 states "The parties request a rule regarding inadvertent disclosures." If the parties agree on such a rule and would like an order from the Court, they may request a ruling by filing an agreed protective order. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 5/2/2017) (awc) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Mon 05/01 10:29 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT Rule 26(f) Conference filed by BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC. (Brod, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/29 4:42 PM
ORIGINAL RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties shall be ready for trial by 12/4/2017. Counsel shall file a joint report setting forth the status of settlement negotiations by 7/10/2017. Discovery due by 10/2/2017. Pretrial Materials (designation of expert witnesses) due by 6/5/2017 by parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 6/26/2017 by parties opposing affirmative relief. Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 9/25/2017. Motions for summary judgment due by 10/2/2017. All other motions except motions in limine due by 10/30/2017. Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures due by 11/20/2017. (Ordered by Senior Judge Mary Lou Robinson on 3/29/2017) (djs) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ardent Health Services, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC. (Urich, Sean) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/17 9:19 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, filed by Ardent Health Services, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Sean C Urich added to party Ardent Health Services(pty:dft), Attorney Sean C Urich added to party BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC(pty:dft) (Urich, Sean) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 02/14 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (daa) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
qcref
Robinson
Tue 02/14 10:44 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Robinson. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (daa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 02/13 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wendy Baxter. (Wheeler, Kalandra) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/13 4:33 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ardent Health Services, BSA Health System of Amarillo, LLC filed by Wendy Baxter. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-8206625) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wheeler, Kalandra) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |