Terhaar v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00398 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 27, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:54 AM CDT |
Defendant
DePuy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson International
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas J. Terhaar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure
Fri 05/27 9:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE - The Court has been notified by the Special Master-James Stanton that defense counsel has confirmed to him that a signed settlement agreement has be executed in this case. The Parties are therefore directed to submit their dismissal papers as soon as the settlement is fully consummated. There appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as open for statistical purposes. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. Nothing in this Order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this case, and should further proceedings become necessary or desirable, any party or the Court may initiate such further proceedings in the same manner as if this Order had not been entered. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 5/27/2022) (chmb) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 02/13 12:43 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Montana; Case Number 9:16-cv-00149. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Texas requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District. (CDH) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
Monday, February 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Paoli, David) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
8 | 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. DePuy Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Paoli, David) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
7 | 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Paoli, David) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
6 | 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/4/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Paoli, David) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
5 | 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. Johnson & Johnson International waiver sent on 1/4/2017, answer due 3/6/2017. (Paoli, David) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Receipt of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL. (CDH) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
Friday, January 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Related Actions. (ASG) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, December 06, 2016 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to DePuy Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Originals mailed to Plaintiff's counsel.) (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Johnson & Johnson International, Inc., and Does 1-10 filed by Nicholas J. Terhaar. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-1876303. (NOS) [Transferred from Montana on 2/13/2017.] |