McPeak v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00399 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2017 4:49 AM CDT |
Defendant
Depuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary A. McPeak
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 29, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation
Tue 12/29 12:35 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc. (Bruksch, Terri) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Tue 12/29 8:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 02/13 1:57 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:16-cv-05942. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8 MDL 2244 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 260); in re Depuy Orthopaedics; Northern District of Texas; assigned to Judge James Edgar Kinkeade. (RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
***Initial Scheduling Deadlines terminated; case assigned to MDL Panel. (DN) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | ||
Tuesday, January 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE of related actions filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Johnson & Johnson & Johnson Services filed with MDL Panel re MDL 2244 in re DePuy Orthopaedics (RS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 | ||
6 | 6 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/13/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/30/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/6/2017, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
5 | 5 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
Monday, November 14, 2016 | ||
4 | 4 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from Clark Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MET) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (MET) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | ||
Thursday, November 10, 2016 | ||
3 | 3 DECLARATION of William J. Leedom re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Leedom, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
2 | 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.; Corporate Parent DePuy, Inc. for DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Leedom, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clark County Superior Court, case number 16 2-05657 5; , filed by DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Leedom, William) [Transferred from Washington Western on 2/13/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 with Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |